Global Patent Index - EP 1253975 A1

EP 1253975 A1 2002-11-06 - METHOD OF PREPARING COMPOUNDS USING CAVITATION AND COMPOUNDS FORMED THEREFROM

Title (en)

METHOD OF PREPARING COMPOUNDS USING CAVITATION AND COMPOUNDS FORMED THEREFROM

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON VERBINDUNGEN MITTELS KAVITATION UND MIT DEM VERFAHREN PRODUZIERTE VERBINDUNGEN

Title (fr)

PREPARATION DE COMPOSES PAR CAVITATION ET COMPOSES AINSI PREPARES

Publication

EP 1253975 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 01906578 A

Priority

  • US 0101523 W
  • US 17611600 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0151202A1] Nanostructured materials and processes for the preparation of these nanostructured materials in high phase purities using cavitation is disclosed. The method preferably comprises mixing a metal containing solution with a precipitating agent and passing the mixture into a cavitation chamber. The chamber consists of a first element to produce cavitation bubbles, and a second element that creates a pressure zone sufficient to collapse the bubbles. The process is useful for the preparation of catalysts and materials for piezoelectrics and superconductors.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B01J 19/00; B01J 23/44; B01J 23/50; B01J 23/80; B01J 37/03

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01J 19/00 (2006.01); B01J 21/06 (2006.01); B01J 23/00 (2006.01); B01J 23/28 (2006.01); B01J 23/44 (2006.01); B01J 23/48 (2006.01); B01J 23/80 (2006.01); B01J 23/83 (2006.01); B01J 23/882 (2006.01); B01J 35/00 (2006.01); B01J 37/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B01J 37/34 (2013.01); B01J 19/008 (2013.01); B01J 21/06 (2013.01); B01J 21/063 (2013.01); B01J 23/002 (2013.01); B01J 23/28 (2013.01); B01J 23/44 (2013.01); B01J 23/48 (2013.01); B01J 23/80 (2013.01); B01J 23/83 (2013.01); B01J 23/882 (2013.01); B01J 35/0013 (2013.01); B82Y 30/00 (2013.01); B01J 2523/00 (2013.01); C01P 2002/60 (2013.01); C01P 2002/72 (2013.01); C01P 2004/64 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. B01J 2523/00 + B01J 2523/17 + B01J 2523/27 + B01J 2523/31
  2. B01J 2523/00 + B01J 2523/68 + B01J 2523/845
  3. B01J 2523/00 + B01J 2523/24 + B01J 2523/3706 + B01J 2523/842
  4. B01J 2523/00 + B01J 2523/44 + B01J 2523/47 + B01J 2523/48
  5. B01J 2523/00 + B01J 2523/54 + B01J 2523/68

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0151202 A1 20010719; AU 3447201 A 20010724; CA 2397367 A1 20010719; EP 1253975 A1 20021106; EP 1253975 A4 20050420; MX PA02006924 A 20041112

INPADOC legal status


2006-06-07 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20051213

2005-07-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050601

2005-04-20 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20050304

2005-04-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 01J 19/00 A

2005-04-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 01J 37/03 B

2005-04-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 01J 23/44 B

2005-04-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 01J 23/50 B

2005-04-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 01J 23/80 B

2002-11-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020814

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI