Global Patent Index - EP 1253981 A1

EP 1253981 A1 2002-11-06 - METHOD FOR SORTING OUT METAL FRACTIONS FROM A STREAM OF BULK MATERIAL

Title (en)

METHOD FOR SORTING OUT METAL FRACTIONS FROM A STREAM OF BULK MATERIAL

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM AUSSORTIEREN VON METALLISCHEN FRAKTIONEN AUS EINEM SCHÜTTGUTSTROM

Title (fr)

PROCEDE POUR EXTRAIRE DES FRACTIONS METALLIQUES D'UN FLUX DE MATIERE EN VRAC

Publication

EP 1253981 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01911348 A

Priority

  • DE 0100108 W
  • DE 10003562 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0154830A1] The invention relates to a device and a method for blowing out metal fractions from a stream of bulk material that is conveyed by bulk material conveying means (10). The device comprises blow-out nozzles (20) which are located on a drop section and which are arranged along a widthwise extension of the stream of bulk material, for blowing against individual particles of bulk material in order to modify the trajectory in such a way as to produce a second sub-stream that branches off. The blow-out nozzles (20) can be controlled according to the sensor coil scanning results relating to the bulk material particles. A plurality of sensor coils (18) is provided underneath an essentially horizontal section of the stream of bulk material in the form of an LC oscillating circuit. Said sensor coils are provided for detecting the eddy currents that are induced. Optoelectronic means (14) are also provided for determining the blow-out position and for determining the location of each of the particles of bulk material.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B07C 5/344; B03B 9/06; B07C 5/342

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B03B 9/06 (2006.01); B07C 5/344 (2006.01); B07C 5/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B07C 5/366 (2013.01); B03B 9/061 (2013.01); B07C 5/344 (2013.01); Y02W 30/526 (2015.05); Y02W 30/528 (2015.05); Y10S 209/93 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0154830A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0154830 A1 20010802; AT 278478 T 20041015; AT 295235 T 20050515; AU 4042301 A 20010807; AU 784959 B2 20060810; CA 2398152 A1 20010802; CA 2398152 C 20090908; CN 1208140 C 20050629; CN 1396845 A 20030212; DE 10003562 A1 20010816; DE 20180017 U1 20020801; EP 1253981 A1 20021106; EP 1253981 B1 20041006; EP 1433541 A1 20040630; EP 1433541 B1 20050511; ES 2230278 T3 20050501; JP 2003520678 A 20030708; NO 20023458 A 20020919; NO 20023458 D0 20020719; PL 204083 B1 20091231; PL 355385 A1 20040419; US 2003038064 A1 20030227; US 6696655 B2 20040224; ZA 200205504 B 20021202

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20180122

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20180116

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20180116

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20180123

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20180116

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20180201

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20180118

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180116

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-03-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20180116

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-01-16 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-16 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-02-01 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-09-04 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50103979

- Representative's name: HANSEN UND HEESCHEN PATENTANWAELTE, DE

2012-02-20 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50103979

- Representative's name: CHRISTIAN BIEHL, DE

2012-02-20 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50103979

- Representative's name: HANSEN UND HEESCHEN PATENTANWAELTE, DE

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050306

2007-09-28 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG;POSTFACH 1772;8027 ZUERICH (CH)

2005-09-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050707

2005-08-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-05-18 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2005-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2230278 T3

2005-03-25 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20041006

2005-01-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050131

2005-01-12 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050112

2005-01-12 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050112

2005-01-06 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050106

2005-01-06 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050106

2005-01-06 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050106

2004-12-22 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20041201

2004-12-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2004-11-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50103979 P 20041111

2004-11-03 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-10-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-10-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-10-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: LT LV RO SI

2004-10-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-10-06 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041006

2004-10-06 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041006

2004-10-06 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041006

2004-05-06 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: METHOD FOR SORTING OUT METAL FRACTIONS FROM A STREAM OF BULK MATERIAL

2003-12-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031028

2002-11-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020625

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: LT PAYMENT 20020625;LV PAYMENT 20020625;RO PAYMENT 20020625;SI PAYMENT 20020625