Global Patent Index - EP 1253986 A1

EP 1253986 A1 2002-11-06 - METHOD AND ARRANGEMENT FOR PRODUCING CASTING MOULDS FROM METAL

Title (en)

METHOD AND ARRANGEMENT FOR PRODUCING CASTING MOULDS FROM METAL

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND ANORDNUNG ZUM HERSTELLEN VON GUSSKÖRPERN AUS METALL

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE FABRICATION DE CORPS COULES EN METAL

Publication

EP 1253986 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00936838 A

Priority

  • AT 1822000 A
  • EP 0004963 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE10026816A1] The invention relates to a method for producing essentially segregation-free and especially freckle-free casting moulds from metal, especially high-alloy steels as well as Ni and Co base alloys having great dimensions, according to an electroslag melting or casting method and using a short, electrically conductive, water-cooled chill mould (10). Electrically conductive elements (16) which are not directly water-cooled are mounted in the wall of said chill mould in an electrically insulated manner in relation to the component of the chill mould (10), whereby said component forms the casting mould. An essentially segregation-free and freckle-free bloom (24) of a surface cross-section that amounts to not more than 90 % of said component of the chill mould (10) is arranged in said chill mould, whereby said component forms the casting mould. The bloom is connected to the supplied metal by means of a slag bath (31) which is heated by the current passage and is situated in the area of the electrically conductive elements (16) and by continually pouring liquid metal (34) in a dosing manner or by supplying solid metal, in the form of granulated metal or rods for instance, that melts open in the hot slag bath (31). The level of the slag (32) in the chill mould (10) is approximately held constant by means of a relative movement between the chill mould (10) and the bloom (24) until the bloom (24) is radially doubled in the desired length. This process involving the doubled bloom (24) and a chill mould (10) of greater dimension is repeated once or several times until the desired final dimension of the casting mould is obtained.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22D 23/10; B22D 11/00; B22D 11/04; B22D 27/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02C 7/00 (2006.01); B22D 11/00 (2006.01); B22D 11/04 (2006.01); B22D 11/041 (2006.01); B22D 19/00 (2006.01); B22D 23/10 (2006.01); B22D 27/02 (2006.01); C22B 9/18 (2006.01); C22B 9/187 (2006.01); C22B 9/193 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/008 (2013.01); B22D 11/04 (2013.01); B22D 23/10 (2013.01); B22D 27/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0158622A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 10026816 A1 20010809; AT 409233 B 20020625; AT A1822000 A 20011115; DE 50002947 D1 20030821; EP 1253986 A1 20021106; EP 1253986 B1 20030716; JP 2003522028 A 20030722; US 6758259 B1 20040706; WO 0158622 A1 20010816

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111201

2012-06-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110531

2012-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110531

2012-03-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110531

2012-03-22 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50002947

- Effective date: 20111201

2012-02-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110531

2012-02-17 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120131

2012-01-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110531

2011-11-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *INTECO INTERNATIONALE TECHNISCHE BERATUNG G.M.B.H

- Effective date: 20110531

2010-10-29 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20100526

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100420

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100519

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-07-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100617

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100324

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-07-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040419

2004-05-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-02-25 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2003-12-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031117

2003-10-16 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031016

2003-08-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50002947 P 20030821

2003-08-20 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-07-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT SE

2003-07-16 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020809

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE