Global Patent Index - EP 1253994 A1

EP 1253994 A1 2002-11-06 - CLAMPING DEVICE

Title (en)

CLAMPING DEVICE

Title (de)

SPANNEINRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE SERRAGE

Publication

EP 1253994 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00902650 A

Priority

EP 0000817 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0156746A1] The invention relates to a clamping device comprising a clamping rail (14) which is displaceably guided in its longitudinal direction; and an actuating device (12) which comprises a grip element (77) that can be displaced by means of the clamping rail (14). The aim of the invention is to produce a clamping device of this type with a high level of operating convenience. To this end, a first bearing element (46) and a second bearing element (48) are fixed on the clamping rail (14), the clamping rail (14) is displaceable in relation to the first bearing element (46) and the first bearing element (46) can rotate in relation to the actuating device (12).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B25B 5/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B25B 5/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25B 5/068 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0156746A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0156746 A1 20010809; DE 50014302 D1 20070614; EP 1253994 A1 20021106; EP 1253994 B1 20070502; US 2003030205 A1 20030213; US 6601837 B2 20030805

INPADOC legal status


2018-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170901

2017-09-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50014302

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160323

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-07-28 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50014302

- Representative's name: HOEGER, STELLRECHT & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE MB, DE

2008-04-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080205

2007-06-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50014302 P 20070614

2007-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE

2006-05-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: BESSEY TOOL GMBH & CO. KG

2005-03-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050214

2004-05-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: BESSEY & SOHN GMBH & CO. KG

2004-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE

2003-08-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: BESSEY & SOHN GMBH & CO

2002-12-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KLIMACH, HORST

2002-12-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: FOSHAG, SIEGFRIED

2002-12-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: PHILIPP, KARL

2002-12-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: ROESCH, HANS

2002-11-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020828

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE