Global Patent Index - EP 1254032 A1

EP 1254032 A1 2002-11-06 - ROLLER

Title (en)

ROLLER

Title (de)

LAUFROLLE

Title (fr)

GALET DE ROULEMENT

Publication

EP 1254032 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01907404 A

Priority

  • DE 10006010 A
  • DE 10008797 A
  • DE 10011101 A
  • EP 0100033 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0158701A1] The invention relates to a roller (10) comprising a hub (11) and a running wheel (1) which consists of rubber and is provided with a running surface (4) and a side surface (3). The aim of the invention is to improve, especially the production of, such a roller. A rotating first hub (7) or a plurality of first recesses which are arranged on an arc of a circle is provided on the side surface (3) and is arranged at a radial distance from the hub.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B60B 33/00; F16C 13/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60B 33/00 (2006.01); F16C 13/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B60B 5/02 (2013.01); B60B 33/0028 (2013.01); F16C 13/006 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0158701A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0158701 A1 20010816; AU 3539201 A 20010820; CN 1422216 A 20030604; DE 20109712 U1 20010927; EP 1254032 A1 20021106; PL 356710 A1 20040628

INPADOC legal status


2004-05-12 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031107

2003-09-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TENTE-ROLLEN GMBH & CO. KG

2003-02-05 [GBC] GB: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED (GB SECTION 78(7)/1977)

2003-01-17 [EL] FR: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED

2002-11-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020812

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO PAYMENT 20020812;SI PAYMENT 20020812