Global Patent Index - EP 1254055 A2

EP 1254055 A2 2002-11-06 - METHOD FOR CLOSING A CONTAINER AND A RESPECTIVE CLOSURE

Title (en)

METHOD FOR CLOSING A CONTAINER AND A RESPECTIVE CLOSURE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM VERSCHLIESSEN EINES BEHÄLTES MIT ZWEI KAPPEN UND ZWICHENZEITLICHER REINIGUNG DER BEHÄLTERMÜNDUNG

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE FERMETURE D'UN RECIPIENT ET FERMETURE ASSOCIEE

Publication

EP 1254055 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00960595 A

Priority

  • DE 29923540 U
  • EP 0008615 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: CA2384279A1] The invention relates to a method for closing a container (2) by means of a closure that comprises a closure cap (37) and a sealing cap (7). The inventi ve method is further characterized in that the opening zone (1) of the containe r (2) is automatically cleaned when the container is closed, namely in the interval between placing the sealing cap (7) and placing the closure cap (37 ) on the container.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 41/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 55/24 (2006.01); B65D 39/04 (2006.01); B65D 51/18 (2006.01); B67B 1/03 (2006.01); B67C 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61L 2/10 (2013.01); A61L 2/202 (2013.01); B67C 7/0073 (2013.01); B67C 7/008 (2013.01); A61L 2202/23 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0117870A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 10041319 A1 20010419; AU 7283900 A 20010410; AU 768068 B2 20031204; BR 0013772 A 20020514; CA 2384279 A1 20010315; CN 1387494 A 20021225; CZ 20020847 A3 20030115; EA 004183 B1 20040226; EA 200200344 A1 20021226; EE 200200124 A 20030415; EP 1254055 A2 20021106; JP 2003525818 A 20030902; MX PA02002472 A 20020730; NO 20021114 A 20020503; NO 20021114 D0 20020306; PL 356205 A1 20040614; TR 200200612 T2 20021223; WO 0117870 A2 20010315; WO 0117870 A3 20020808; ZA 200201902 B 20030307

INPADOC legal status


2005-05-18 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20041111

2004-05-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2004-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031114

2003-04-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030210

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-11-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI