Global Patent Index - EP 1254062 A1

EP 1254062 A1 2002-11-06 - BAG ASSEMBLY

Title (en)

BAG ASSEMBLY

Title (de)

BEUTELANORDNUNG

Title (fr)

ENSEMBLE SAC

Publication

EP 1254062 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00987857 A

Priority

  • NZ 0000254 W
  • NZ 50209999 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0147785A1] A bag assembly (30) includes an inner bag (1) with an outer cover (20). An open end (22) of the cover (20) is positioned around a spout (6) providing an inlet/outlet for the bag (1). After the bag (1) has been filled, and the spout (6) has been sealed, the bag assembly (30) is itself sealed by the sealing of the upper end of the cover (20). The bag assembly (30) can then be inverted and with the cover (20) removed and the bag (1) lifted, the cutting open of the spout (6) will enable the discharge of the material.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 77/04; B65B 69/00; B65D 88/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 19/22 (2006.01); B65D 30/08 (2006.01); B65D 65/04 (2006.01); B65D 75/56 (2006.01); B65D 75/58 (2006.01); B65D 77/04 (2006.01); B65D 88/16 (2006.01); B65D 88/22 (2006.01); B65D 88/54 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 31/04 (2013.01); B65D 75/5866 (2013.01); B65D 88/1618 (2013.01); B65D 88/1668 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0147785 A1 20010705; AR 027089 A1 20030312; AU 2413301 A 20010709; AU 780848 B2 20050421; EP 1254062 A1 20021106; EP 1254062 A4 20041020; JP 2003519050 A 20030617; US 2002191869 A1 20021219

INPADOC legal status


2006-03-22 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050920

2005-01-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041202

2004-10-20 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20040902

2004-07-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 65D 77/04 A

2004-07-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 65D 88/16 B

2004-07-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 65B 69/00 B

2002-11-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020710

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI