Global Patent Index - EP 1254066 A1

EP 1254066 A1 2002-11-06 - METHOD FOR FEEDING A THREAD IN A TWIST-FREE MANNER AND THREAD FEEDING DEVICE

Title (en)

METHOD FOR FEEDING A THREAD IN A TWIST-FREE MANNER AND THREAD FEEDING DEVICE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR TWISTFREIEN LIEFERUNG EINES FADENS UND FADENLIEFERGERÄT

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE LIVRAISON D'UN FIL SANS TORSION ET DISPOSITIF LIVREUR DE FIL

Publication

EP 1254066 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01905759 A

Priority

  • DE 10006142 A
  • EP 0101455 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0158794A1] The invention relates to a thread that is fed to a textile machine in a twist-free manner and has a band-like character. The thread is taken from a stock in a twist-free manner and is mounted on a stationary storage drum in a thread feeding appliance having a rotatable central shaft and a winding element which protrudes therefrom and towards the outside. Said thread is supplied to the textile machine in an overhead manner and by means of the storage drum. During operation of the thread feeding appliance, functional twists are produced in the thread only during transition from the central shaft into the winding element. Said twists are inhibited from being transported back against the thread path direction and, together with the thread, are regularly conveyed to the storage drum in almost perfect match with the rotations of the central shaft. At least one sliver guide gap (G) that is stationary in relation to the central shaft is provided in the thread feeding appliance (F) and along the thread path in the central shaft (S, 4) in the area of transition (7) of the central shaft into the winding element (W).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 51/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 51/22 (2006.01); D03D 47/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D03D 47/361 (2013.01); B65H 2701/37 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0158794A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0158794 A1 20010816; CN 100347061 C 20071107; CN 1400953 A 20030305; DE 10006142 A1 20010816; EP 1254066 A1 20021106; EP 1254066 B1 20040811; US 2003122018 A1 20030703; US 6726139 B2 20040427

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120901

2012-12-13 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50103218

- Effective date: 20120901

2012-11-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120209

2011-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110419

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110226

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-02-26 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090228

2009-10-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090228

2009-10-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090228

2009-09-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2009-08-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *IROPA A.G.

- Effective date: 20090228

2008-08-29 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20080304

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20080221

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-08-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050512

2005-03-23 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-09-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50103218 P 20040916

2004-09-08 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-08-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BOVARD AG PATENTANWAELTE

2004-08-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-08-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE IT LI

2002-11-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020730

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR