Global Patent Index - EP 1254071 A1

EP 1254071 A1 2002-11-06 - PRE-TABLE FOR CONTAINER TREATMENT MACHINES

Title (en)

PRE-TABLE FOR CONTAINER TREATMENT MACHINES

Title (de)

VORTISCH FÜR GEFÄSSBEHANDLUNGSMASCHINEN

Title (fr)

TABLE ANTERIEURE POUR MACHINES DE MANIPULATION DE RECIPIENTS

Publication

EP 1254071 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01919257 A

Priority

  • DE 20002483 U
  • EP 0101174 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6935246B2] A receiving table for container processing machines having a table top ( 3 ) which stands on feet ( 2 ) and has transport elements (T) for the containers arranged on it, the table top housing an inclined top plate ( 3 a) and a bottom plate ( 3 b) which is rigidly connected to the former and together with it forms a cavity ( 4 ). The top side of the table top ( 3 ) is provided with a water-repellant coating to facilitate runoff of liquids and cleaning of the tablet plate, and yields a stable, lightweight and inexpensive construction.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B67C 3/00; B67C 3/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B67C 3/00 (2006.01); B67C 3/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B67C 3/22 (2013.01); B67C 3/005 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0158801A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

DE 20002483 U1 20010329; AT 273924 T 20040915; AU 4641601 A 20010820; EP 1254071 A1 20021106; EP 1254071 B1 20040818; ES 2230288 T3 20050501; US 2003089284 A1 20030515; US 6935246 B2 20050830; WO 0158801 A1 20010816

INPADOC legal status


2017-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170221

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-05-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160204

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170131

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170112

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160301

2017-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160203

2017-01-12 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-11-07 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160301

2016-10-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160203

2016-01-08 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-05-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150128

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20150113

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-03-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20150210

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-09-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100204

2010-11-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100203

2010-10-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100228

2010-10-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100228

2010-10-05 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2010-09-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2010-04-30 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Effective date: 20091201

2009-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20090206

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-06-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20090213

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-04-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20090211

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050118

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *KRONES A.G.

- Effective date: 20050228

2005-08-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *KRONES A.G.

- Effective date: 20050228

2005-08-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050519

2005-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2230288 T3

2005-04-01 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-03-23 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2005-02-28 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050228

2005-02-28 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050228

2005-02-03 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050203

2005-02-03 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050203

2005-02-03 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050203

2005-01-25 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20040818

2004-12-14 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-12-08 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20041115

2004-11-18 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041118

2004-11-18 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041118

2004-09-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50103318 P 20040923

2004-09-22 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-08-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-08-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATENTANWALTSBUERO JEAN HUNZIKER

2004-08-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-08-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-08-18 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040818

2004-08-18 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040818

2004-08-18 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040818

2003-04-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030311

2002-11-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020706

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI