Global Patent Index - EP 1254072 A1

EP 1254072 A1 2002-11-06 - HAND HOLDABLE PUMP SPRAY APPARATUS

Title (en)

HAND HOLDABLE PUMP SPRAY APPARATUS

Title (de)

VON HAND BETÄTIGBARES PUMP-SPRÜHGERÄT

Title (fr)

APPAREIL PORTATIF DE VAPORISATION A POMPE

Publication

EP 1254072 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00984023 A

Priority

  • US 0033233 W
  • US 45717199 A
  • US 72306700 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0142129A1] A hand holdable pump spray apparatus is disclosed where the pump mechanism is in the hand holdable wand (14) rather than in a spaced apart liquid container. The wand (14) may be held with one handle (54) is extended with other hand. This creates a pressure differential which allows liquid to flow from the container (10), passed a check valve (84) and into the wand (14). After filling, a biased spring provides a force against the liquid creating a higher pressure in the wand (14) than ambient pressure. This closes the check valve (84). When an operator depresses an actuator (68), another valve (88) opens allowing the liquid in the wand (14) to be ejected through a nozzle (66).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B67D 1/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 83/76 (2006.01); B67D 1/16 (2006.01); B05B 9/04 (2006.01); B05B 9/043 (2006.01); B05B 9/08 (2006.01); B05B 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05B 9/043 (2013.01); B05B 9/0426 (2013.01); B05B 9/0877 (2013.01); B05B 9/0883 (2013.01); B05B 11/3015 (2013.01); B05B 11/3091 (2013.01); B05B 1/3033 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0142129 A1 20010614; AT 380158 T 20071215; AU 2070301 A 20010618; AU 759592 B2 20030417; AU 759592 C 20031030; CA 2393687 A1 20010614; CA 2393687 C 20061003; CN 1221321 C 20051005; CN 1414922 A 20030430; CZ 20021931 A3 20030115; DE 60037336 D1 20080117; DK 1254072 T3 20080414; EP 1254072 A1 20021106; EP 1254072 A4 20060315; EP 1254072 B1 20071205; ES 2296664 T3 20080501; HU 0203272 A2 20030128; HU 0203272 A3 20040528; IL 150078 D0 20021201; JP 2003516228 A 20030513; JP 4377097 B2 20091202; MX PA02005658 A 20021129; NO 20022745 A 20020807; NO 20022745 D0 20020607; NZ 519481 A 20040227; PL 193683 B1 20070330; PL 355996 A1 20040531

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171229

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20171227

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-01-31 [PGFP TR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Payment date: 20171201

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171227

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-12-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-12-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-12-17 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111208

2013-07-03 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20130703

2013-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120701

2012-11-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111207

2012-10-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111231

2012-07-11 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120701

2012-06-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: OMS INVESTMENTS, INC.

- Effective date: 20111231

2011-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101207

2011-06-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20101224

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-06-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20101227

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-05-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091208

2011-03-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20101224

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20101223

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-01-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100104

2010-10-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091231

2010-10-29 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091207

2010-10-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091231

2010-08-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091207

2010-08-09 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

2010-07-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100607

2010-07-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2010-07-27 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2010-06-17 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20100607

2010-01-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20091119

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-08-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071207

2009-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20081229

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-07-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071205

2009-06-30 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20081231

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-02-27 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20081230

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-02-27 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20081125

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-01-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20081229

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-01-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20081230

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-01-30 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20081224

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-11-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080908

2008-07-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071231

2008-06-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2008-05-26 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20071205

2008-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2296664 T3

2008-04-15 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20080400620

2008-04-14 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2008-03-25 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2008-03-12 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20080229

2008-02-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ARNOLD & SIEDSMA AG

2008-01-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60037336 P 20080117

2007-12-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2007-12-21 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2007-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2007-12-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2007-12-05 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2007-02-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070119

2006-03-15 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20060131

2006-03-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B67D 1/16 20060101AFI20010618BHEP

2006-03-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B05B 9/04 20060101ALI20060125BHEP

2002-11-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020702

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 20020702;LT PAYMENT 20020702;LV PAYMENT 20020702;MK PAYMENT 20020704;RO PAYMENT 20020702;SI PAYMENT 20020702