Global Patent Index - EP 1254091 A1

EP 1254091 A1 2002-11-06 - METHOD FOR FUNCTIONALISING A DOUBLE BOND

Title (en)

METHOD FOR FUNCTIONALISING A DOUBLE BOND

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR FUNKTIONALISIERUNG EINER DOPPELBINDUNG

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE FONCTIONNALISATION D'UNE DOUBLE LIAISON

Publication

EP 1254091 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 01907730 A

Priority

  • FR 0100364 W
  • FR 0001744 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0158833A1] The invention concerns a method for functionalising a double bond and, more particularly, a double bond bearing a metalloid atom. Said functionalisation is produced by the action of perhalogenated sulphonyl chloride on the carbon bearing sulphur in the presence of a free radical initiator, preferably by homolytic cleavage. The invention is useful in organic synthesis.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07B 37/02; C07C 31/34; C07C 69/63; C07D 301/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07B 37/02 (2006.01); C07B 39/00 (2006.01); C07C 31/34 (2006.01); C07C 31/36 (2006.01); C07C 41/22 (2006.01); C07C 41/30 (2006.01); C07C 43/12 (2006.01); C07C 67/287 (2006.01); C07C 67/293 (2006.01); C07C 69/14 (2006.01); C07C 69/24 (2006.01); C07C 319/20 (2006.01); C07C 323/09 (2006.01); C07F 7/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07B 39/00 (2013.01); C07B 37/02 (2013.01); C07C 31/34 (2013.01); C07C 41/30 (2013.01); C07C 67/293 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

C07C 41/30 + C07C 43/16

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0158833 A1 20010816; AU 3562801 A 20010820; CA 2397834 A1 20010816; EP 1254091 A1 20021106; FR 2804955 A1 20010817; FR 2804955 B1 20030214; HU 0204388 A2 20030528; JP 2003522743 A 20030729; US 2003114721 A1 20030619; US 2004225160 A1 20041111; US 7230147 B2 20070612

INPADOC legal status


2009-03-25 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080902

2008-01-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SHASUN PHARMA SOLUTIONS LIMITED

2006-09-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021220

2003-02-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021220

2003-01-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ROQUES, NICOLAS

2002-11-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020710

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI