Global Patent Index - EP 1254137 A1

EP 1254137 A1 2002-11-06 - PYRIDO 2,3-d PYRIMIDINE-2,7-DIAMINE KINASE INHIBITORS

Title (en)

PYRIDO 2,3-d PYRIMIDINE-2,7-DIAMINE KINASE INHIBITORS

Title (de)

2,7-DIAMINE PYRIDO(2,3-D)PYRIMIDIN KINASE INHIBITOR

Title (fr)

INHIBITEURS DE PYRIDO 2,3-D PYRIMIDINE-2,7-DIAMINE KINASE

Publication

EP 1254137 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 01900591 A

Priority

  • IB 0100069 W
  • US 17826100 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0155147A1] Disclosed are compounds of the formula (I) wherein: R<2>, R<7>, R<13>, R<14> and R15 are independently hydrogen, or (un)substituted lower alkyl, (un)substitued lower alkenyl, (un)substituted lower alkynyl, or (un)substituted -(CH2)nR<12>; R<5> is halogen, cyano, nitro, -R<9>, -NR<9>R<10>, or -OR<9>; R<6> is halogen, cyano, nitro, -R<9>, -NR<9>R<10>, -OR<9>, -Co2R<9>, -COR<9>, -CONR<9>R<10>, -NR<9>COR<10>, (un)substituted lower alkenyl, or (un)substituted lower alkynyl; R<8> is -CO2R<13>, -COR<13>, -CONR<13>R<14>, -CSNR<13>R<14>, -C(NR<13>)NR<14>R<15>, -SO3R<13>, -S02R<13>, -SO2NR<13>R<14>, -PO3R<13>R<14>, -POR<13>R<14>, -PO(NR<13>R<14>)2; R<9> and R<10> are independently hydrogen or (un)substituted lower alkyl; R<11> is a heteroaryl or a heterocyclic group; R<12> is a cycloalkyl, a heterocyclic, an aryl, or a heteroaryl group; and n is 0,1,2, or 3. These compounds and their pharmaceutical compositions are useful for treating cell proliferative disorders, such as cancer and restenosis. These compounds are potent inhibitors of cdks and growth factor-mediated kinases.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07D 471/04; A61K 31/305

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/305 (2006.01); A61K 31/519 (2006.01); A61P 9/10 (2006.01); A61P 17/06 (2006.01); A61P 35/00 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01); C07D 471/04 (2006.01); C07F 9/6561 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07D 471/04 (2013.01); C07F 9/6561 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0155147A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL LT LV MK RO SI

EPO simple patent family

WO 0155147 A1 20010802; AP 200202586 A0 20020930; AR 030044 A1 20030813; AU 2542501 A 20010807; BG 106850 A 20030228; BR 0107751 A 20021112; CA 2397961 A1 20010802; CA 2397961 C 20080826; CN 1395578 A 20030205; CO 5261549 A1 20030331; CR 6706 A 20050404; CZ 20022475 A3 20030312; DZ 3266 A1 20010802; EA 200200643 A1 20021226; EE 200200405 A 20031215; EP 1254137 A1 20021106; GT 200100016 A 20011019; HN 2001000013 A 20010618; HU 0204141 A2 20030428; HU 0204141 A3 20050329; IL 150545 D0 20030212; IS 6443 A 20020625; JP 2003523357 A 20030805; JP 4047010 B2 20080213; MA 26868 A1 20041220; MX PA02007221 A 20021129; NO 20023527 A 20020910; NO 20023527 D0 20020724; OA 12161 A 20060508; PA 8510701 A1 20021211; PE 10662001 A1 20011022; PL 356802 A1 20040712; SK 10632002 A3 20030603; SV 2002000294 A 20020716; TN SN01014 A1 20051110; YU 50402 A 20051128; ZA 200205879 B 20030929

INPADOC legal status


2010-07-21 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20100121

2007-11-07 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: PYRIDO 2,3-D PYRIMIDINE-2,7-DIAMINE KINASE INHIBITORS

2007-03-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040308

2007-02-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: WARNER-LAMBERT COMPANY LLC

2005-06-01 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: WARNER-LAMBERT COMPANY LLC

2004-04-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040308

2002-11-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020708

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 20020708;LT PAYMENT 20020708;LV PAYMENT 20020708;MK PAYMENT 20020708;RO PAYMENT 20020708;SI PAYMENT 20020708