Global Patent Index - EP 1254155 A4

EP 1254155 A4 2003-06-18 - MOB-5/HMOB-5 AS A CANCER DIAGNOSTIC MARKER

Title (en)

MOB-5/HMOB-5 AS A CANCER DIAGNOSTIC MARKER

Title (de)

MOB-5/HMOB-5 ALS DIAGNOSTISCHES MARKIERUNGSMITTEL

Title (fr)

MOB-5/HMOB-5 UTILISE COMME MARQUEUR DIAGNOSTIC POUR LE CANCER

Publication

EP 1254155 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 01903364 A

Priority

  • US 0102680 W
  • US 17818500 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0155170A1] The invention provides isolated nucleic acids comprising the nucleic acids set forth in the Sequence Listing as SEQ ID NO:1(corresponding to a cDNA encoding a rat Mob-5 protein), SEQ ID NO:3(corresponding to a cDNA encoding the cancer specific human Mob-5 protein homolog with an internal deletion of 53 amino acid residues, referred to as cMob-5.), SEQ ID NO:5(corresponding to a cDNA encoding a human Mob-5 protein), SEQ ID NO:7(corresponding to a nucleic acid encoding a rat Mob-5-AP fusion protein and SEQ ID NO:9(corresponding to a nucleic acid encoding a human Mob-5-AP fusion protein). The invention also provides purified polypeptides having the sequences set forth in the Sequence Listing as any of SEQ ID NO:2, SEQ ID NO:4, SEQ ID NO:6, SEQ ID NO:8 and SEQ ID NO:10. This invention also relates to a method of detecting the presence of cancer in a patient comprising: a) contacting a sample from the patient with an antibody to Mob-5; and b) detecting the binding of the antibody with an antigen in the sample, wherein binding of antigen to the antibody indicates the presence of Mob-5 antigen in the sample and wherein Mob-5 antigen in the sample indicates the presence of cancer in the patient, thereby detecting the presence of cancer in the patient.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07H 21/04; A61K 38/00; A61K 48/00; C07K 16/00; G01N 33/53

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07K 16/30 (2006.01); G01N 33/574 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01N 33/5748 (2013.01); C07K 16/30 (2013.01); A61K 2039/505 (2013.01); G01N 2800/52 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [Y] WO 9964576 A2 19991216 - LEWIS MARCIA E [US], et al
  • [X] CHIA SOO ET AL: "CUTANEOUS RAT WOUNDS EXPRESS C49A A NOVEL GENE WITH HOMOLOGY TO THEHUMAN MELANOMA DIFFERENTIATION ASSOCIATED GENE MDA-7", JOURNAL OF CELLULAR BIOCHEMISTRY, WILEY-LISS INC, US, vol. 74, AF004774, 1 July 1999 (1999-07-01), pages 1 - 10, XP000943248, ISSN: 0730-2312 & DATABASE EMBL [online] 11 September 1997 (1997-09-11), "Rattus norvegicus c49a mRNA, complete cds", XP002237763, Database accession no. AF004774Rattus norvegicus c49a mRNA, complete cdsEMBL19970911AF004774 & DATABASE SWALL [online] 1 November 1999 (1999-11-01), "C49a", XP002237764, Database accession no. Q9WVP8C49aSWALL19991101Q9WVP8
  • [X] JIANG H ET AL: "SUBTRACTION HYBRIDIZATION IDENTIFIES A NOVEL MELANOMA DIFFERENTIATION ASSOCIATED GENE, MDA-7, MODULATED DURING HUMAN MELANOMA DIFFERENTIATION, GROWTH AND PROGRESSION", ONCOGENE, BASINGSTOKE, HANTS, GB, vol. 11, no. 12, Q13007, 21 December 1995 (1995-12-21), pages 2477 - 2486, XP002064717, ISSN: 0950-9232 & DATABASE EMBL [online] 31 December 1995 (1995-12-31), "Human MDA-7 mRNA, complete cds", XP002237765, Database accession no. U16261Human MDA-7 mRNA, complete cdsEMBL19951231U16261 & DATABASE SWALL [online] 1 November 1997 (1997-11-01), "Interleukin-24 precursor (MDA-7)", XP002237766, Database accession no. Q13007Interleukin-24 precursor (MDA-7)SWALL19971101Q13007 & WO 9511986 A1 19950504 - UNIV COLUMBIA [US]
  • [Y] JO HAKRYUL ET AL: "Cloning oncogenic Ras-regulated genes by differential display.", METHODS (ORLANDO), vol. 16, no. 4, December 1998 (1998-12-01), pages 365 - 372, XP002237762, ISSN: 1046-2023
  • [Y] LIANG P ET AL: "RAS ACTIVATION OF GENES: MOB-1 AS A MODEL", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA, NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCE. WASHINGTON, US, vol. 91, December 1994 (1994-12-01), pages 12515 - 12519, XP002928076, ISSN: 0027-8424
  • See also references of WO 0155170A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0155170 A1 20010802; WO 0155170 A9 20021017; AU 3119201 A 20010807; EP 1254155 A1 20021106; EP 1254155 A4 20030618

INPADOC legal status


2009-06-10 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20081213

2003-06-18 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20030506

2002-11-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020826

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI