Global Patent Index - EP 1254197 A1

EP 1254197 A1 2002-11-06 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR CONTROLLING A FLUID CATALYTIC CRACKER

Title (en)

METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR CONTROLLING A FLUID CATALYTIC CRACKER

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR REGELUNG EINES FLUIDKATALYTISCHEN CRACKERS

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET SYSTEME DE REGULATION D'UN CRAQUEUR CATALYTIQUE FLUIDE

Publication

EP 1254197 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 01942374 A

Priority

  • US 0101068 W
  • US 17634200 P
  • US 17876200 P
  • US 53198900 A
  • US 63343900 A
  • US 63361200 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0151588A1] In a distillation control system, a nuclear magnetic resonance (NMR) sensor identifies the composition of petroleum distillates from a distillation tower, and preferably also identifies the composition of the input feed method. This information is processed to obtain estimates of values of selected properties of the distillates and the feed. These values are provided to a multivariate controller, together with a setpoint of desired quality factors selected on the basis of competitive market forces, environmental regulations and economic factors including feed and product prices and operating cost. On the basis of the NMR measured values of selected quality properties, the multivariate controller generates values of manipulated operating variables that, when applied to the distillation system, adjust the distillation operation to reduce differences between the controlled variables and their respective setpoints. The ultimate values of the operating variables are determined, preferably in conjunction with an optimizer so that product qualities are maintained and the tower is operated in an economically optimum manner subject to specific characteristics of the refinery.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C10G 11/18; B01J 8/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01J 19/00 (2006.01); C10G 7/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B01J 19/0006 (2013.01); B01J 19/0033 (2013.01); C10G 7/12 (2013.01); B01J 2219/00168 (2013.01); B01J 2219/00186 (2013.01); G01N 24/08 (2013.01); G01N 24/085 (2013.01); G01R 33/4625 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0151588 A1 20010719; WO 0151588 A8 20011101; AU 2940801 A 20010724; AU 3091901 A 20010724; CA 2397555 A1 20010719; CA 2397566 A1 20010719; CN 1422324 A 20030604; CN 1427877 A 20030702; EP 1254197 A1 20021106; EP 1257614 A1 20021120; WO 0151589 A1 20010719; WO 0151589 A8 20020221

INPADOC legal status


2004-11-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040511

2004-02-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031229

2003-07-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FOXBORO NMR, LTD.

2003-05-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KARG, RANDAL, W.

2003-05-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: CLINKSCALES, THOMAS, A.

2003-05-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: GIAMATTEO, PAUL, J.

2003-05-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: EDWARDS JOHN, C.

2002-11-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020814

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI