Global Patent Index - EP 1254204 A1

EP 1254204 A1 2002-11-06 - LAUNDRY DETERGENT COMPOSITIONS WITH A COMBINATION OF A CYCLIC AMINE POLYMER AND A DYE TRANSFER INHIBITOR

Title (en)

LAUNDRY DETERGENT COMPOSITIONS WITH A COMBINATION OF A CYCLIC AMINE POLYMER AND A DYE TRANSFER INHIBITOR

Title (de)

WÄSCHEWASCHMITTELZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ENTHALTEND EINE KOMBINATION VON EINEM AUF ZYKLISCHEM AMIN BASIERENDEN POLYMER UND EINEM FARBSTOFFÜBERTRAGUNGSINHIBITOR

Title (fr)

COMPOSITIONS DE DETERGENTS A LESSIVE POSSEDANT UNE COMBINAISON D'UN POLYMERE D'AMINE CYCLIQUE ET D'UN INHIBITEUR DE TRANSFERT DE COULEURS

Publication

EP 1254204 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00906022 A

Priority

US 0003458 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0159054A1] Detergent compositions and fabric conditioning compositions which include from about 0.001 % to about 20.0 %, by weight of a mixture of a cyclic amine based polymer, oligomer or copolymer and a Dye Transfer Inhibiting ingredient.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 3/37; C11D 3/00; C11D 3/22; C11D 3/386; C11D 3/39

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06L 1/12 (2006.01); C11D 3/00 (2006.01); C11D 3/04 (2006.01); C11D 3/08 (2006.01); C11D 3/12 (2006.01); C11D 3/22 (2006.01); C11D 3/34 (2006.01); C11D 3/37 (2006.01); C11D 3/386 (2006.01); C11D 3/39 (2006.01); D06L 3/02 (2006.01); D06L 3/11 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/0021 (2013.01); C11D 3/222 (2013.01); C11D 3/3723 (2013.01); C11D 3/3776 (2013.01); C11D 3/3792 (2013.01); C11D 3/38663 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0159054A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0159054 A1 20010816; AR 027397 A1 20030326; AU 2759000 A 20010820; BR 0017098 A 20030114; EP 1254204 A1 20021106; JP 2003522284 A 20030722; MX PA02007754 A 20021011

INPADOC legal status


2005-03-30 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040917

2004-06-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040506

2002-12-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BABA, HAJIME

2002-12-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: HIKI, SHINTARO

2002-12-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SARNAIK, KHIZAR MOHAMED KHAN

2002-12-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MURATA, SUSUMU

2002-12-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: PANANDIKER, RAJAN, KESHAV

2002-12-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BABA, HAJIME

2002-12-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: HIKI, SHINTARO

2002-12-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SARNAIK, KHIZAR MOHAMED KHAN

2002-12-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MURATA, SUSUMU

2002-12-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: PANANDIKER, RAJAN, KESHAV

2002-11-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020823

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-11-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI