Global Patent Index - EP 1254205 A1

EP 1254205 A1 2002-11-06 - FABRIC CARE COMPOSITION

Title (en)

FABRIC CARE COMPOSITION

Title (de)

ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR TEXTILPFLEGE

Title (fr)

COMPOSITION D'ENTRETIEN DE TISSUS

Publication

EP 1254205 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 01909668 A

Priority

  • EP 0100640 W
  • GB 0002964 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0159053A1] A fabric care composition comprises one or more textile compatible carriers and an amphoteric polymer which is capable of self cross-linking and/or of reacting with cellulose and which preferably comprises two or more isocyanate end groups. The compositions may be used to treat fabric as part of a laundering process and improve the surface colour definition of the fabric following multiple washings and/or impart pill and/or fuzz resistance to fabric during laundering.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 3/37

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/00 (2006.01); C11D 3/37 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/3726 (2013.01); C11D 3/001 (2013.01); C11D 3/37 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0159053A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0159053 A1 20010816; AR 027395 A1 20030326; AT 277159 T 20041015; AU 3732701 A 20010820; BR 0108172 A 20021029; BR 0108172 B1 20100629; CA 2407019 A1 20010816; DE 60105763 D1 20041028; DE 60105763 T2 20050224; DE 60105763 T3 20080807; EP 1254205 A1 20021106; EP 1254205 B1 20040922; EP 1254205 B2 20071205; ES 2227144 T3 20050401; ES 2227144 T5 20080416; GB 0002964 D0 20000329

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110802

2012-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110123

2012-02-20 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20120220

2011-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110122

2011-12-15 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60105763

- Effective date: 20110802

2011-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110122

2011-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110131

2011-10-14 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110930

2011-09-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110122

2010-06-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100127

- Year of fee payment: 10

2010-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100125

- Year of fee payment: 10

2010-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100205

- Year of fee payment: 10

2010-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100126

- Year of fee payment: 10

2010-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20100126

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-07-25 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

2008-04-16 [REG ES DC2A] PATENT MODIFIED

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T5

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050222

2007-12-05 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20071205

2007-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2005-11-02 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2005-09-07 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: HENKEL KOMMANDITGESELLSCHAFT AUF AKTIEN

- Effective date: 20050622

2005-08-31 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: HENKEL KOMMANDITGESELLSCHAFT AUF AKTIENVTP (PATENT

- Effective date: 20050622

2005-07-29 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2227144 T3

2005-04-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2005-03-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-02-25 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20040922

2005-01-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050131

2005-01-24 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050124

2005-01-22 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050122

2005-01-22 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050122

2004-12-22 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041222

2004-12-22 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041222

2004-12-22 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041222

2004-10-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60105763 P 20041028

2004-10-20 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2004-09-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-09-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-09-22 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-09-22 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040922

2004-09-22 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040922

2004-09-22 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040922

2004-09-22 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040922

2004-09-22 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040922

2004-09-22 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040922

2004-09-22 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040922

2004-09-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: PARKER, ANDREW, PHILIP

2002-11-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020619

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI