Global Patent Index - EP 1254211 A1

EP 1254211 A1 2002-11-06 - CELL PRODUCTION

Title (en)

CELL PRODUCTION

Title (de)

HERSTELLUNG VON ZELLEN

Title (fr)

PRODUCTION DE CELLULES

Publication

EP 1254211 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 01901033 A

Priority

  • AU 0100030 W
  • AU PQ509800 A
  • AU PQ704500 A
  • AU PQ714300 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0151611A1] A method of producing neurectoderm cells, which method includes providing a source of early primitive ectoderm-like (EPL) cells; a conditioned medium as hereinbefore defined; or an extract therefrom exhibiting neural inducing properties; and contacting the EPL cells with the conditioned medium, for a time sufficient to generate controlled differentiation to neurectoderm cells.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 5/06; C12N 5/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/47 (2006.01); C12N 5/079 (2010.01); C12N 5/0793 (2010.01); C12N 15/12 (2006.01); A61K 35/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12N 5/0622 (2013.01); C07K 14/47 (2013.01); C12N 5/0619 (2013.01); A61K 35/12 (2013.01); C12N 2500/25 (2013.01); C12N 2501/11 (2013.01); C12N 2501/115 (2013.01); C12N 2501/155 (2013.01); C12N 2501/60 (2013.01); C12N 2502/14 (2013.01); C12N 2506/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0151611 A1 20010719; CA 2397292 A1 20010719; EP 1254211 A1 20021106; EP 1254211 A4 20030716; WO 0151610 A1 20010719

INPADOC legal status


2006-10-11 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060420

2005-05-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: BRESAGEN INC.

2003-10-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030910

2003-07-16 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20030530

2003-07-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 12N 5/06 A

2003-07-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 12N 5/08 B

2003-07-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 07K 14/47 B

2002-11-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020809

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI