Global Patent Index - EP 1254214 A2

EP 1254214 A2 2002-11-06 - HUMAN PROTEIN KINASES AND PROTEIN KINASE-LIKE ENZYMES

Title (en)

HUMAN PROTEIN KINASES AND PROTEIN KINASE-LIKE ENZYMES

Title (de)

HUMANE PROTEINKINASEN UND PROTEINKINASE-ÄHNLICHE ENZYME

Title (fr)

NOUVELLES PROTEINES KINASES HUMAINES ET ENZYMES SEMBLABLES AUX PROTEINES KINASES

Publication

EP 1254214 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 01906658 A

Priority

  • US 0102337 W
  • US 17807800 P
  • US 17936400 P
  • US 18317300 P
  • US 19016200 P
  • US 19340400 P
  • US 24701300 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0155356A2] The present invention relates to kinase polypeptides, nucleotides sequences encoding the kinase polypeptides, as well as various products and methods useful for the diagnosis and treatment jof various kinase-related diseases and conditions. Through the use of a bioinformatics strategy, mammalian members of the of PTK's and STK's have been identified and their protein structure predicted.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/09 (2006.01); A61K 38/45 (2006.01); A61P 3/00 (2006.01); A61P 9/00 (2006.01); A61P 9/02 (2006.01); A61P 9/12 (2006.01); A61P 15/10 (2006.01); A61P 21/04 (2006.01); A61P 25/00 (2006.01); A61P 25/02 (2006.01); A61P 25/04 (2006.01); A61P 25/06 (2006.01); A61P 25/14 (2006.01); A61P 25/16 (2006.01); A61P 25/18 (2006.01); A61P 25/24 (2006.01); A61P 25/28 (2006.01); A61P 31/04 (2006.01); A61P 31/10 (2006.01); A61P 31/12 (2006.01); A61P 35/00 (2006.01); A61P 37/00 (2006.01); A61P 37/06 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01); C07K 16/40 (2006.01); C12N 1/15 (2006.01); C12N 1/19 (2006.01); C12N 1/21 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); C12N 9/12 (2006.01); C12N 9/16 (2006.01); C12N 9/99 (2006.01); C12Q 1/48 (2006.01); C12Q 1/68 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 16/40 (2013.01); C12N 9/16 (2013.01); C12Q 1/485 (2013.01); G01N 2500/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0155356A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0155356 A2 20010802; WO 0155356 A3 20020328; AU 3454401 A 20010807; CA 2398430 A1 20010802; EP 1254214 A2 20021106; JP 2003520602 A 20030708

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-04 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1051703

2008-01-16 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070724

2007-10-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SUGEN, INC.

2007-04-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070313

2003-01-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: PLOWMAN, GREGORY D.

2003-01-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: WHYTE, DAVID

2003-01-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MANNING, GERARD

2003-01-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SUDARSANAM, SUCHA

2003-01-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MARTINEZ, RICARDO

2002-11-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020823

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI