Global Patent Index - EP 1254256 A2

EP 1254256 A2 2002-11-06 - NOVEL NUCLEIC ACIDS AND POLYPEPTIDES

Title (en)

NOVEL NUCLEIC ACIDS AND POLYPEPTIDES

Title (de)

NEUARTIGE NUKLEINSÄURE UND POLYPEPTIDE

Title (fr)

NOUVEAUX ACIDES NUCLEIQUES ET POLYPEPTIDES ASSOCIES

Publication

EP 1254256 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00990304 A

Priority

  • US 0035017 W
  • US 47127599 A
  • US 48872500 A
  • US 55231700 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: CA2395736A1] The present invention provides novel nucleic acids, novel polypeptide sequences encoded by these nucleic acids and uses thereof.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07K 14/47; A61K 31/713; A61K 38/17; A61K 39/395; C07K 14/475; C07K 16/28; C12N 5/10; C12Q 1/68; G01N 33/53; G01N 33/566

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/713 (2006.01); A61K 38/16 (2006.01); A61K 38/17 (2006.01); A61K 38/18 (2006.01); A61K 38/19 (2006.01); A61K 39/395 (2006.01); C07H 21/00 (2006.01); C07H 21/02 (2006.01); C07K 14/47 (2006.01); C07K 14/475 (2006.01); C07K 14/48 (2006.01); C07K 16/00 (2006.01); C07K 16/18 (2006.01); C07K 16/22 (2006.01); C07K 16/28 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); C12N 15/12 (2006.01); C12N 15/16 (2006.01); C12N 15/63 (2006.01); C12N 15/64 (2006.01); C12P 21/00 (2006.01); C12Q 1/68 (2006.01); G01N 33/53 (2006.01); G01N 33/566 (2006.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

AU 2595501 A 20010731; AU 2596501 A 20010731; AU 2734801 A 20010731; AU 783303 B2 20051013; CA 2395736 A1 20010726; CA 2395763 A1 20010726; EP 1242580 A1 20020925; EP 1242580 A4 20030514; EP 1254256 A2 20021106; EP 1254256 A4 20050119

INPADOC legal status


2006-06-07 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20051129

2005-01-19 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20041206

2004-10-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 07K 14/47 A

2004-10-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 07K 14/475 B

2004-10-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 07K 16/28 B

2004-10-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 12N 5/10 B

2004-10-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 12Q 1/68 B

2004-10-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 01N 33/53 B

2004-10-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 01N 33/566 B

2004-10-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 38/17 B

2004-10-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 31/713 B

2004-10-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 39/395 B

2003-09-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: NUVELO, INC.

2003-07-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: NUVELO INC.

2002-11-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020624

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI