Global Patent Index - EP 1254265 A1

EP 1254265 A1 2002-11-06 - METHODS AND MATERIALS RELATING TO METALLOCARBOXYPEPTIDASE-LIKE POLYPEPTIDES AND POLYNUCLEOTIDES

Title (en)

METHODS AND MATERIALS RELATING TO METALLOCARBOXYPEPTIDASE-LIKE POLYPEPTIDES AND POLYNUCLEOTIDES

Title (de)

METHODEN UND MATERIALIEN ZUR VERWENDUNG BEI METALLOCARBOXYPEPTIDASEN-ÄHNLICHEN POLYPEPTIDEN UND POLYNUKLEOTIDEN

Title (fr)

METHODES ET MATERIAUX CONCERNANT DES POLYPEPTIDES ET DES POLYNUCLEOTIDES DU TYPE METALLOCARBOXYPEPTIDASE

Publication

EP 1254265 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 01907012 A

Priority

  • US 0103783 W
  • US 49691400 A
  • US 56087500 A
  • US 67613500 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0157265A1] The invention provides novel polynucleotides and polypeptides encoded by such polynucleotides and mutants or variants thereof that correspond to a novel human secreted metallocarboxypeptidase-like polypeptide. These polynucleotides comprise nucleic acid sequences isolated from cDNA library from small intestine (Hyseq clone identification numbers 11732488 (SEQ ID NO: 1)). Other aspects of the invention include vectors containing processes for producing novel human secreted metallocarboxypeptidase-like polypeptides, and antibodies specific for such polypeptides.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 9/48; A61K 39/395; C07H 21/04; C07K 5/00; C12P 19/34; C12Q 1/68

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 33/53 (2006.01); A61K 31/7088 (2006.01); A61K 38/46 (2006.01); A61K 38/55 (2006.01); A61K 45/00 (2006.01); A61K 48/00 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01); C07K 16/40 (2006.01); C12N 1/15 (2006.01); C12N 1/19 (2006.01); C12N 1/21 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); C12N 9/48 (2006.01); C12N 15/09 (2006.01); C12Q 1/02 (2006.01); C12Q 1/68 (2006.01); G01N 33/15 (2006.01); G01N 33/566 (2006.01); G01N 37/00 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12N 9/48 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0157265 A1 20010809; AU 3484801 A 20010814; CA 2399672 A1 20010809; EP 1254265 A1 20021106; EP 1254265 A4 20040630; JP 2004515207 A 20040527

INPADOC legal status


2005-02-09 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040804

2004-06-30 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20040517

2004-06-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 12N 9/48 A

2004-06-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 12Q 1/68 B

2004-06-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 12P 19/34 B

2004-06-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 07H 21/04 B

2004-06-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 07K 5/00 B

2004-06-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 39/395 B

2003-09-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NUVELO, INC.

2003-07-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NUVELO INC.

2002-11-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020827

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI