Global Patent Index - EP 1254269 A1

EP 1254269 A1 2002-11-06 - METHODS AND MATERIALS RELATING TO NEURONAL GUIDANCE MOLECULE-LIKE (NGM-LIKE) POLYPEPTIDES AND POLYNUCLEOTIDES

Title (en)

METHODS AND MATERIALS RELATING TO NEURONAL GUIDANCE MOLECULE-LIKE (NGM-LIKE) POLYPEPTIDES AND POLYNUCLEOTIDES

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND MATERIALIEN IN VERBINDUNG MIT POLYPEPTIDEN UND POLYNUKLEOTIDEN, WELCHE NEURONALEN FÜHRUNGSMOLEKÜLEN GLEICHEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDES ET MATIERES LIES AUX POLYPEPTIDES ET AUX POLYNUCLEOTIDES DU TYPE MOLECULE DE GUIDAGE NEURONAL (DU TYPE NGM)

Publication

EP 1254269 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 01908837 A

Priority

  • US 0103661 W
  • US 49691400 A
  • US 56087500 A
  • US 72111500 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0157262A1] The invention provides novel polynucleotides and polypeptides encoded by such polynucleotides and mutants or variants thereof that correspond to novel human secreted NGM-like polypeptides. These polynucleotides comprise nucleic acid sequences isolated from at least cDNA libraries prepared from adult spleen mRNA (GIBCO) (Hyseq clone identification numbers 3073928 (SEQ ID NO: 1), and from infant brain mRNA (Columbia University) (Hyseq clone identification number 6346549) (SEQ ID NO: 18). Other aspects of the invention include vectors containing processes for producing novel human secreted NGM-like polypeptides, and antibodies specific for such polypeptides.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07K 14/47

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/47 (2006.01); C12N 9/16 (2006.01); C12N 9/64 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12N 9/6432 (2013.01); C07K 14/47 (2013.01); C12N 9/16 (2013.01); C12Y 304/21006 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0157262 A1 20010809; AU 3666301 A 20010814; CA 2399652 A1 20010809; EP 1254269 A1 20021106; EP 1254269 A4 20041027; EP 1574520 A2 20050914; EP 1574520 A3 20051221

INPADOC legal status


2005-07-06 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050503

2005-02-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050110

2004-10-27 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20040913

2004-05-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 07K 14/47 A

2003-09-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: NUVELO, INC.

2003-07-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: NUVELO INC.

2002-11-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020827

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI