Global Patent Index - EP 1254270 A1

EP 1254270 A1 2002-11-06 - METHODS AND MATERIALS RELATING TO CUB DOMAIN POLYPEPTIDES AND POLYNUCLEOTIDES

Title (en)

METHODS AND MATERIALS RELATING TO CUB DOMAIN POLYPEPTIDES AND POLYNUCLEOTIDES

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND MATERIALIEN IN VERBINDUNG MIT CUB DOMÄNEN POLYPEPTIDEN UND POLYNUKLEOTIDEN

Title (fr)

METHODES ET MATIERES RELATIVES AUX POLYNUCLEOTIDES ET POLYPEPTIDES DU DOMAINE CUB

Publication

EP 1254270 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 01908909 A

Priority

  • US 0103905 W
  • US 49691400 A
  • US 56087500 A
  • US 67821600 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0157267A1] The invention provides novel polynucleotides and polypeptides encoded by such polynucleotides and mutants or variants thereof that correspond to a novel human secreted CUB domain polypeptide. These polynucleotides comprise nucleic acid sequences isolated from cDNA library from testis (Hyseq clone identification numbers 2924342 (SEQ ID NO: 1)). Other aspects of the invention include vectors containing processes for producing novel humain secreted CUB domain polypeptides, and antibodies specific for such polypeptides.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12Q 1/68; A61K 39/395; C07H 21/04; C07K 5/00; C12P 19/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 33/50 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61K 45/00 (2006.01); A61K 48/00 (2006.01); A61P 3/10 (2006.01); A61P 7/00 (2006.01); A61P 7/10 (2006.01); A61P 11/00 (2006.01); A61P 11/02 (2006.01); A61P 11/06 (2006.01); A61P 17/00 (2006.01); A61P 17/02 (2006.01); A61P 17/04 (2006.01); A61P 19/00 (2006.01); A61P 19/02 (2006.01); A61P 19/04 (2006.01); A61P 19/10 (2006.01); A61P 25/00 (2006.01); A61P 25/16 (2006.01); A61P 25/28 (2006.01); A61P 27/02 (2006.01); A61P 29/00 (2006.01); A61P 31/00 (2006.01); A61P 31/04 (2006.01); A61P 31/12 (2006.01); A61P 31/18 (2006.01); A61P 33/06 (2006.01); A61P 35/00 (2006.01); A61P 37/00 (2006.01); A61P 37/02 (2006.01); A61P 37/08 (2006.01); A61P 41/00 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01); C07K 14/47 (2006.01); C07K 16/18 (2006.01); C12N 1/15 (2006.01); C12N 1/19 (2006.01); C12N 1/21 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); C12N 9/16 (2006.01); C12N 9/64 (2006.01); C12N 15/09 (2006.01); C12P 21/02 (2006.01); C12Q 1/02 (2006.01); C12Q 1/68 (2006.01); G01N 33/15 (2006.01); G01N 33/53 (2006.01); G01N 37/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12N 9/6432 (2013.01); C07K 14/47 (2013.01); C12N 9/16 (2013.01); C12Y 304/21006 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0157267 A1 20010809; WO 0157267 A9 20030109; AU 3672101 A 20010814; CA 2399686 A1 20010809; EP 1254270 A1 20021106; EP 1254270 A4 20040407; JP 2003521251 A 20030715

INPADOC legal status


2005-03-30 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040923

2004-06-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040512

2004-04-07 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20040223

2003-09-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NUVELO, INC.

2003-07-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NUVELO INC.

2002-11-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020826

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI