Global Patent Index - EP 1254295 A2

EP 1254295 A2 2002-11-06 - HOOD LATCH WITH SELF-RETRACTING SECONDARY LATCH RELEASE ARM

Title (en)

HOOD LATCH WITH SELF-RETRACTING SECONDARY LATCH RELEASE ARM

Title (de)

VERRIEGELUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR MOTORHAUBE MIT EINEM AUTOMATISCH EINZIEHBAREN SEKUNÄREN FREIGABEARM

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE VERROUILLAGE DE CAPOT DOTE D'UN SECOND LEVIER DE DECLENCHEMENT AUTO-RETRACTABLE

Publication

EP 1254295 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 01942396 A

Priority

  • CA 0100121 W
  • US 17622200 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0151745A2] A latch assembly (10) has a housing having a mouth. A ratchet (12) is pivotally mounted to the housing and is movable to cooperate with the mouth to pivot between an open condition, a primary closed condition and a secondary closed condition for receiving, engaging and cinching a keeper of a striker. The ratchet (12) is biased to the open condition. A pivotally mounted pawl (40) is biased into engagement with the ratchet for releasably retaining the ratchet in the primary closed condition. A secondary release arm (20) is mounted to rotate about a first axis and a second axis. The secondary release arm (20) is rotatable about the first axis between a retracted position and an extended position, and is rotatable out the second axis between an engaging position and a disengaging position. The secondary release arm (20) is biased to the retracted position and biased to the engaging position. The secondary release arm (20) interengages with the ratchet (12) for coupled movement therewith from the primary closed condition to the secondary closed condition effecting movement of the secondary release arm (20) from the retracted position to the extended position upon the pawl (40) being rotated to disengage from the ratchet (12). Upon moving the secondary release arm (20) from the engaging position to the disengaging position, the secondary release arm (20) disengages from the ratchet (12) for independent movement enabling the ratchet (12) to rotate from the secondary closed condition to the open condition and back to the primary closed condition. The secondary release arm (20) also rotates from the extended position to the retracted position.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 65/19

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 65/19 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 83/16 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0151745A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0151745 A2 20010719; WO 0151745 A3 20010913; AU 2824501 A 20010724; BR 0107631 A 20021008; CA 2395255 A1 20010719; CA 2395255 C 20080715; DE 60118371 D1 20060518; DE 60118371 T2 20070329; EP 1254295 A2 20021106; EP 1254295 B1 20060329

INPADOC legal status


2017-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170801

2017-08-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60118371

2016-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160115

2016-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160201

2016-10-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160930

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160112

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-05-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150108

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150109

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-01-08 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070115

2007-09-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070115

2007-03-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070102

2006-10-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-07-10 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060710

2006-06-29 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060629

2006-05-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60118371 P 20060518

2006-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2006-03-29 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2006-03-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060329

2006-01-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: INTIER AUTOMOTIVE CLOSURES INC.

2004-05-26 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BANIAK, GRZEGORZ

2004-05-26 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: TOMASZEWSKI, KRIS

2004-05-26 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: GHORGHORIAN, DIKRAN

2004-05-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BANIAK, GRZEGORZ

2004-05-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: TOMASZEWSKI, KRIS

2004-05-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: GHORGHORIAN, DIKRAN

2004-05-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040329

2004-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2003-01-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: INTIER AUTOMOTIVE CLOSURES INC.

2002-11-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020712

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI