Global Patent Index - EP 1254302 A1

EP 1254302 A1 2002-11-06 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR EVACUATING A TURBINE CONDENSER

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR EVACUATING A TURBINE CONDENSER

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM EVAKUIEREN EINES TURBINENKONDENSATORS

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT DE PRODUIRE LE VIDE DANS LE CONDENSATEUR DE TURBINE

Publication

EP 1254302 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00985216 A

Priority

  • EP 00985216 A
  • EP 0013039 W
  • EP 00102718 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0159265A1] In order to evacuate a turbine condenser, air (L) contained in the turbine condenser (1) is suctioned using propellant steam from a starting jet pump (19). According to the invention, the propellant steam (D) and the air (L) are guided into an auxiliary condenser (5) which is arranged downstream from said turbine condenser (1)

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01K 9/02; F28B 9/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01K 9/02 (2006.01); F28B 1/02 (2006.01); F28B 9/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01K 9/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0159265A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0159265 A1 20010816; CN 1325767 C 20070711; CN 1434895 A 20030806; DE 50010850 D1 20050901; EP 1254302 A1 20021106; EP 1254302 B1 20050727; JP 2004502893 A 20040129; JP 4579479 B2 20101110; US 2003000215 A1 20030102; US 6755023 B2 20040629

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20171221

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20180305

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180219

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-02-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20171211

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20171207

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171214

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-12-14 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-09-29 [REG CH PCOW] CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF PATENT OWNER(S)

- Free text: NEW ADDRESS: WERNER-VON-SIEMENS-STRASSE 1, 80333 MUENCHEN (DE)

2016-12-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-12-14 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2009-03-31 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG;INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY FREILAGERSTRASSE 40;8047 ZUERICH (CH)

2006-07-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060428

2006-04-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-11-08 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2005-09-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050822

2005-09-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50010850 P 20050901

2005-08-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG

2005-07-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-07-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

2005-07-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-10-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040831

2004-05-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

2002-11-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020628

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR