Global Patent Index - EP 1254309 A1

EP 1254309 A1 2002-11-06 - THROTTLE VALVE ARRANGEMENT WITH EMERGENCY AIR DEVICE

Title (en)

THROTTLE VALVE ARRANGEMENT WITH EMERGENCY AIR DEVICE

Title (de)

DROSSELKLAPPENANORDNUNG MIT NOTLUFTEINRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

ENSEMBLE PAPILLON DES GAZ COMPORTANT UNE UNITE D'ALIMENTATION DE SECOURS EN AIR

Publication

EP 1254309 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00991068 A

Priority

  • DE 0004467 W
  • DE 10005786 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0159279A1] The invention relates to a throttle valve arrangement with an emergency air supply, in the form of an additional flap (4), which normally closes an emergency air opening (8) in the throttle valve (3). On failure of the drive mechanism (13), said additional flap may be rotated relative to the throttle valve, in order to open the emergency air supply, such that the internal combustion engine obtains sufficient air for the journey to a garage, or similar.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02D 9/02; F02D 9/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02D 9/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02D 9/02 (2013.01); F02D 2009/0277 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0159279A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0159279 A1 20010816; BR 0017095 A 20030114; BR 0017095 B1 20090113; EP 1254309 A1 20021106; EP 1254309 B1 20050720; MX PA02007722 A 20021023; US 2003019471 A1 20030130; US 6561161 B2 20030513

INPADOC legal status


2011-05-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091215

2010-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091214

2010-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100701

2010-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091231

2010-09-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100831

2010-08-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20091214

2010-07-27 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20081216

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081219

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20081212

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-03-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20081212

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-06-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060421

2006-04-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-11-08 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2005-08-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50010782 P 20050825

2005-08-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050720

2005-07-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB SE

2005-07-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB SE

2002-11-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020301

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR