Global Patent Index - EP 1254313 A2

EP 1254313 A2 2002-11-06 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING A SEQUENCE OF HIGH-VOLTAGE IGNITION SPARKS AND HIGH-VOLTAGE IGNITION DEVICE

Title (en)

METHOD FOR PRODUCING A SEQUENCE OF HIGH-VOLTAGE IGNITION SPARKS AND HIGH-VOLTAGE IGNITION DEVICE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR ERZEUGUNG EINER FOLGE VON HOCHSPANNUNGSZÜNDFUNKEN UND HOCHSPANNUNGSZÜNDVORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

PROCEDE POUR PRODUIRE UNE SERIE D'ETINCELLES D'ALLUMAGE HAUTE TENSION ET DISPOSITIF D'ALLUMAGE HAUTE TENSION

Publication

EP 1254313 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 01903597 A

Priority

  • DE 0100031 W
  • DE 10003109 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE10003109A1] The invention relates to a method for producing a sequence of high-voltage ignition sparks. According to said method, an ignition energy accumulator (2) is charged until it reaches a predetermined charge state (I>p<, >ZUND<), an ignition spark is produced by discharging said ignition energy accumulator (2) on an ignition spark producing means (6) which is connected to the ignition energy accumulator (2), a process of recharging the ignition energy accumulator (2) is started before the ignition energy accumulator is fully discharged, and another ignition spark is produced on the ignition spark producing means (6) by discharging the ignition energy accumulator (2).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02P 3/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02P 15/10 (2006.01); F02P 17/12 (2006.01); F23Q 3/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02P 17/12 (2013.01); F02P 15/10 (2013.01); F23Q 3/004 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0155588A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

DE 10003109 A1 20010802; EP 1254313 A2 20021106; EP 1254313 B1 20030702; JP 2003521619 A 20030715; RU 2268394 C2 20060120; US 2003089355 A1 20030515; US 6666195 B2 20031223; WO 0155588 A2 20010802; WO 0155588 A3 20020321

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110802

2011-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110108

2011-12-22 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50100351

- Effective date: 20110802

2011-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110131

2011-10-14 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110930

2010-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100324

- Year of fee payment: 10

2010-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100209

- Year of fee payment: 10

2010-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100123

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-06-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040405

2004-05-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-02-25 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2003-12-29 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20030702

2003-08-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50100351 P 20030807

2003-08-06 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-07-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2002-11-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020923

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI