Global Patent Index - EP 1254316 A1

EP 1254316 A1 2002-11-06 - CONTROL DEVICE FOR A HYDRAULIC CONTROL MOTOR

Title (en)

CONTROL DEVICE FOR A HYDRAULIC CONTROL MOTOR

Title (de)

STEUERVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINEN HYDRAULISCHEN STELLMOTOR

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE POUR SERVOMOTEUR HYDRAULIQUE

Publication

EP 1254316 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01900472 A

Priority

  • DE 10006141 A
  • EP 0100628 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0159305A1] The invention concerns a hydraulic control motor (41), comprising at least one valve (48) actively controlled by a setting force and at least one passive valve (49) cooperating with the actively controlled valve (48), said passive valve being simultaneously controlled by means of a line (25).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F15B 13/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F15B 13/042 (2006.01); F15B 11/00 (2006.01); F15B 13/04 (2006.01); F15B 13/043 (2006.01); F16K 31/124 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F15B 13/0405 (2013.01); F15B 11/006 (2013.01); F15B 13/0433 (2013.01); F15B 2211/30575 (2013.01); F15B 2211/3116 (2013.01); Y10T 137/87201 (2015.04); Y10T 137/87209 (2015.04)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0159305A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0159305 A1 20010816; DE 10006141 A1 20010906; EP 1254316 A1 20021106; EP 1254316 B1 20030827; JP 2003525399 A 20030826; JP 4619605 B2 20110126; US 2003010194 A1 20030116; US 6712091 B2 20040330

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20180125

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180308

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-06-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140120

2015-05-28 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ROBERT BOSCH AUTOMOTIVE STEERING GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ZF LENKSYSTEME GMBH, 73527 SCHWAEBISCH GMUEND, DE

- Document: DE 50100555

- Effective date: 20150423

2014-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140131

2014-10-31 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140930

2013-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130204

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-06-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120113

- Year of fee payment: 12

2004-08-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040528

2004-06-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-04-21 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-02-25 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20030827

2003-12-09 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-10-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50100555 P 20031002

2003-10-01 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-08-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2003-08-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-08-27 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030827

2002-11-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020515

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR