Global Patent Index - EP 1254386 A2

EP 1254386 A2 2002-11-06 - STRUCTURALLY FLEXIBLE WAVEGUIDE

Title (en)

STRUCTURALLY FLEXIBLE WAVEGUIDE

Title (de)

STRUKTURELL FLEXIBLER WELLENLEITER

Title (fr)

GUIDE D'ONDE A STRUCTURE FLEXIBLE

Publication

EP 1254386 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 01904954 A

Priority

  • US 0101942 W
  • US 17881900 P
  • US 54607700 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0155757A2] A robust, inexpensive, and flexible apparatus that transports electromagnetic radiation to a receiving device. The apparatus includes a waveguide with a proximal and distal ends. A sheath formed from superelastic alloys is formed around the outer diameter of the waveguide. A housing is formed near the distal and proximal ends of the waveguide to provide structural support for the ends of the waveguide. Additionally, a connector is coupled to each housing to connect to a radiation source or a receiving device. The connector may be a FSMA connector and the apparatus may be used in a variety of medical and industrial applications.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G02B 6/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G02B 6/42 (2006.01); G02B 6/44 (2006.01); A61B 17/00 (2006.01); A61B 18/22 (2006.01); G02B 6/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G02B 6/4429 (2013.01); G02B 6/4296 (2013.01); A61B 18/22 (2013.01); A61B 2017/00867 (2013.01); G02B 6/032 (2013.01); G02B 6/3813 (2013.01); G02B 2006/4297 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0155757A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0155757 A2 20010802; WO 0155757 A3 20020418; WO 0155757 A9 20030109; AU 3288101 A 20010807; EP 1254386 A2 20021106

INPADOC legal status


2008-01-23 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070801

2007-07-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050209

2006-11-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050209

2005-08-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: CLINICON CORPORATION

2005-03-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050209

2002-11-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020828

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI