Global Patent Index - EP 1254405 A2

EP 1254405 A2 2002-11-06 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING AND CHECKING FORGE-PROOF DOCUMENTS

Title (en)

METHOD FOR PRODUCING AND CHECKING FORGE-PROOF DOCUMENTS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR ERSTELLUNG UND ÜBERPRÜFUNG FÄLSCHUNGSSICHERER DOKUMENTE

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION ET DE CONTROLE DE DOCUMENTS INFALSIFIABLES

Publication

EP 1254405 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00982952 A

Priority

  • DE 0003507 W
  • DE 19948319 A
  • DE 10020563 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0125880A2] The invention relates to a method for producing forge-proof documents using a security module, whereby the security module generates a temporary secret which is unknown to the document producer. The temporary secret, in conjunction with information revealed about the identity of the security module, is transferred in encrypted form to an authentication unit. Said authentication unit decodes the temporary secret, recognizes the identity of the security module and the temporary secret together with other information which is coded in such a way that only one checking station can implement decoding and transfer said temporary secret to the document producer. The document producer transfers producer data, which is integrated into the document, to the security module. The data introduced into the security module by said document producer is irreversibly linked with the temporary secret in such a way that repeated linking of the same data in the same manner yields an identical result. It is not possible to draw conclusions about the temporary secret. The inventive method is characterized in that the result of the irreversible linking of data introduced by said document producer can be introduced into said document together with said temporary secret. The invention also relates to a method for checking the authenticity of a given document.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06K 19/10 (2006.01); G06Q 20/00 (2006.01); G09C 1/00 (2006.01); H04L 9/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04L 9/3247 (2013.01); H04L 9/3263 (2013.01); H04L 2209/56 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0125880A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0125880 A2 20010412; WO 0125880 A3 20020815; AU 1992401 A 20010510; AU 773985 B2 20040610; CA 2425184 A1 20030407; DE 10083046 D2 20020307; EP 1254405 A2 20021106; JP 2003527782 A 20030916; NZ 518162 A 20030926; US 7237120 B1 20070626

INPADOC legal status


2013-10-23 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20130503

2012-05-18 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1051585

2009-01-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20081219

2003-04-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030217

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-11-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI