Global Patent Index - EP 1254407 A2

EP 1254407 A2 2002-11-06 - PORTABLE COMPUTER

Title (en)

PORTABLE COMPUTER

Title (de)

TRAGBARER COMPUTER

Title (fr)

ORDINATEUR PORTATIF

Publication

EP 1254407 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 01903599 A

Priority

  • DE 0100215 W
  • DE 10004075 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0157630A2] The invention relates to a portable computer comprising a basic enclosure (1) and a display (2) which is fastened to the basic enclosure (1) by means of a display fastening means (3), whereby the basic enclosure (1) comprises a propping device, for example, a strut (5), a pivotal plate (6) or a rotational plate (8). These elements serve to prop up the basic enclosure (1) with a propping angle ( alpha ) that ranges from 30 DEG to 90 DEG with regard to a propping plane (7). This permits the display (2) to be placed in a position that is elevated with regard to the propping surface (7).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 1/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 1/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06F 1/1616 (2013.01); G06F 1/166 (2013.01); G06F 1/1669 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0157630A2

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0157630 A2 20010809; WO 0157630 A3 20020321; AU 3152301 A 20010814; DE 10004075 A1 20010816; DE 10190358 D2 20030417; EP 1254407 A2 20021106

INPADOC legal status


2013-01-23 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20120801

2011-04-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FUJITSU TECHNOLOGY SOLUTIONS INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY

2008-08-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080714

2004-04-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FUJITSU SIEMENS COMPUTERS GMBH

2002-11-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020515

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI