Global Patent Index - EP 1254414 A1

EP 1254414 A1 2002-11-06 - METHOD FOR SELECTING PRODUCTS

Title (en)

METHOD FOR SELECTING PRODUCTS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR AUSWAHL VON PRODUKTEN

Title (fr)

PROC D POUR LA S LECTION DE PRODUITS

Publication

EP 1254414 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01905673 A

Priority

  • DE 10005832 A
  • EP 0100629 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0159611A1] The invention concerns a method for selecting products, wherein a data record having a plurality of characteristics of the product is assigned to each product, wherein the selection of a product is made based on specifications pertaining to the characteristics chosen by the user and wherein the selection is shown on a graphic display unit (100). The invention aims at simplifying the selection method in such a way that the number of results is limited by simplified characteristic specification. This is achieved in that characteristic specifications are carried out on at least two scales (205a, 205b) and the specifications on said scales are given with the aid of at least one input device that is connected to the graphic display unit.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 17/30; G06F 17/60

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 17/30 (2006.01); G06Q 10/08 (2012.01); G06Q 30/06 (2012.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06F 17/30398 (2013.01); G06Q 10/087 (2013.01); G06Q 30/0641 (2013.01); Y10S 707/99933 (2013.01); Y10S 707/99934 (2013.01); Y10S 715/962 (2013.01); Y10S 715/968 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0159611A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0159611 A1 20010816; AU 3369901 A 20010820; CA 2399607 A1 20010816; CA 2399607 C 20080212; DE 10005832 A1 20010830; DE 10005832 B4 20070419; EP 1254414 A1 20021106; US 2003112272 A1 20030619; US 7089506 B2 20060808

INPADOC legal status


2011-04-06 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20101112

2007-05-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050614

2005-08-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: GANTENHAMMER, JULIA

2005-08-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050614

2005-08-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: GANTENHAMMER, ANDREAS

2005-08-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: GANTENHAMMER, ANDREAS

2002-11-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020805

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI