Global Patent Index - EP 1254433 A2

EP 1254433 A2 2002-11-06 - PROOF OF POSTAGE DIGITAL FRANKING

Title (en)

PROOF OF POSTAGE DIGITAL FRANKING

Title (de)

BEWEIS FÜR DIGITALE POSTFRANKIERUNG

Title (fr)

AFFRANCHISSEMENT NUMERIQUE SERVANT DE PREUVE D'EXPEDITION

Publication

EP 1254433 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00991955 A

Priority

  • US 0042141 W
  • US 18065300 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0154071A2] A system for printing postal indicia. The system includes at least one postal security device (22) which is linked to a customer host (24); where both the security device (22) and customer host (24) are connected to a data center (20).

[origin: WO0154071A2] A system for printing postal indicia. The system includes at least one postal security device connected to a data center and a customer host associated with a respective postal security device connected to the data center. The postal security device is adapted to provide secure data to be included in the postal indicia and the customer host is adapted to request the postal indicia from the data center and print the postal indicia including the generated data.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07B 1/00; G07B 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07B 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07B 17/00733 (2013.01); G07B 17/00435 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00145 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00201 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00967 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0154071 A2 20010726; WO 0154071 A3 20020321; WO 0154071 A9 20020829; AU 3643501 A 20010731; CA 2403799 A1 20010726; EP 1254433 A2 20021106; EP 1254433 A4 20040901

INPADOC legal status


2006-01-04 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050628

2005-02-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041215

2004-09-01 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20040716

2004-09-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 07B 1/00 A

2004-09-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 07B 17/00 B

2002-11-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020923

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI