Global Patent Index - EP 1254460 A2

EP 1254460 A2 2002-11-06 - 1T FLASH MEMORY RECOVERY SCHEME FOR OVER-ERASURE

Title (en)

1T FLASH MEMORY RECOVERY SCHEME FOR OVER-ERASURE

Title (de)

UBERLÖSCHKORREKTURVERFAHREN FUR 1T FLASHSPEICHER

Title (fr)

SCHEMA DE RECUPERATION D'UNE MEMOIRE FLASH A UN TRANSISTOR, A PARTIR D'UN SUREFFACEMENT

Publication

EP 1254460 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 01923557 A

Priority

  • EP 0101034 W
  • US 17923400 P
  • US 77222001 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0156035A2] A method is provided which uses a uniform electric potential across tunnel oxide, based on a uniform field to allow memory cell recovery from over-erasure.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G11C 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G11C 11/56 (2006.01); G11C 16/34 (2006.01); G11C 16/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G11C 16/3409 (2013.01); G11C 11/5621 (2013.01); G11C 11/5628 (2013.01); G11C 11/5635 (2013.01); G11C 16/3404 (2013.01); G11C 5/145 (2013.01); G11C 16/0416 (2013.01); G11C 16/0433 (2013.01); G11C 2211/565 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0156035A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0156035 A2 20010802; WO 0156035 A3 20020425; DE 60127532 D1 20070510; EP 1252632 A2 20021030; EP 1254460 A2 20021106; EP 1254460 B1 20070328; TW 520493 B 20030211; US 2003092236 A1 20030515; WO 0157876 A2 20010809; WO 0157876 A3 20020307

INPADOC legal status


2008-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070328

2008-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070629

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071116

2008-03-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080102

2007-11-16 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2007-05-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60127532 P 20070510

2007-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR

2007-03-07 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR

2004-09-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040728

2004-05-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE FR

2003-01-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SHUM, DANNY

2003-01-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: TEMPEL, GEORG

2003-01-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: LUDWIG, CHRISTOPH

2002-11-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020713

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI