Global Patent Index - EP 1254464 A1

EP 1254464 A1 2002-11-06 - CONNECTION SYSTEM FOR SUBMARINE ACOUSTIC ANTENNA

Title (en)

CONNECTION SYSTEM FOR SUBMARINE ACOUSTIC ANTENNA

Title (de)

VERBINDUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR AKUSTISCHE UNTERWASSERANTENNE

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE CONNEXION POUR ANTENNE ACOUSTIQUE SOUS-MARINE

Publication

EP 1254464 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00977630 A

Priority

  • FR 0003094 W
  • FR 9914598 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0137294A1] The invention concerns connection systems for a submarine acoustic antenna. It consists in connecting the antenna (201-206) to elements (102) of the sonar by an optical link. A removable transformer (210, 211) enables to separate galvanically the antenna and the transmission means. It powers a VCSEL electro-optical element (216) which energises an optical fibre (217) connected to the pressure hull penetrators (108). The invention enables to produce an antenna having a very large number of sensors.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01F 38/14; H01R 13/66

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B63G 8/39 (2006.01); G01S 7/52 (2006.01); H01F 38/14 (2006.01); H01Q 1/34 (2006.01); H04B 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01F 38/14 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0137294A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0137294 A1 20010525; EP 1254464 A1 20021106; FR 2801417 A1 20010525; FR 2801417 B1 20020208; JP 2003514474 A 20030415; NO 20022347 A 20020516; NO 20022347 D0 20020516; NO 322803 B1 20061211; US 6811327 B1 20041102

INPADOC legal status


2009-06-24 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20081219

2008-08-27 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE GB SE

2007-11-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20071029

2004-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE GB LI SE

2002-11-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020417

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR