Global Patent Index - EP 1254478 A1

EP 1254478 A1 2002-11-06 - A CHEMICAL SENSOR USING CHEMICALLY INDUCED ELECTRON-HOLE PRODUCTION AT A SCHOTTKY BARRIER

Title (en)

A CHEMICAL SENSOR USING CHEMICALLY INDUCED ELECTRON-HOLE PRODUCTION AT A SCHOTTKY BARRIER

Title (de)

CHEMISCHER SNESOR BASIEREND AUF DER CHEMISCH INDUZIERTEN GENERIERUNG VON ELEKTRON-LOCHPAAREN IN EINEM SCHOTTKY-ÜBERGANG

Title (fr)

DETECTEUR CHIMIQUE UTILISANT UNE PRODUCTION DE TROUS D'ELECTRONS INDUITE CHIMIQUEMENT AU NIVEAU D'UNE BARRIERE DE SCHOTTKY

Publication

EP 1254478 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99973730 A

Priority

US 9929363 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0154171A1] Electron-hole production at a Schottky barrier has recently been observed experimentally as a result of chemical processes. This conversion of chemical energy to electronic energy may serve as a basic link between chemistry and electronics and offers the potential for generation of unique electronic signatures for chemical reactions and the creation of a new class of solide state chemical sensors. Detection of the following chemical species was established: hydrogen, deuterium, carbon monoxide, molecular oxygen. The detector (1b) consists of a Schottky diode between an Si layer and an ultrathin metal layer with zero force electrical contacts.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01L 21/00; G01N 27/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 27/414 (2006.01); B01J 23/50 (2006.01); C23C 14/16 (2006.01); G01N 27/00 (2006.01); G01N 27/416 (2006.01); H01L 29/47 (2006.01); H01L 29/872 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01N 27/129 (2013.01); H01L 2224/48463 (2013.01); H01L 2224/4918 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0154171 A1 20010726; AU 6333300 A 20010731; EP 1254478 A1 20021106; EP 1254478 A4 20041201; JP 2003520351 A 20030702

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-12 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20090218

2007-08-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070704

2004-12-01 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20041018

2004-12-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 01L 21/00 A

2004-12-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 01N 27/00 B

2003-05-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ADRENA, INC.

2003-03-26 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MCFARLAND, ERIC, W.

2003-03-26 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WEINBERG, W., HENRY

2003-03-26 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: NIENHAUS, HERMANN

2003-03-26 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BERGH, HOWARD, S.

2003-03-26 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: GERGEN, BRIAN

2003-03-26 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MUJUMDAR, ARUNAVA

2003-01-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MCFARLAND, ERIC, W.

2003-01-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WEINBERG, W., HENRY

2003-01-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: NIENHAUS, HERMANN

2003-01-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BERGH, HOWARD, S.

2003-01-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: GERGEN, BRIAN

2003-01-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MUJUMDAR, ARUNAVA

2002-11-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020731

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-11-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 20020731;LT PAYMENT 20020731;LV PAYMENT 20020731;MK PAYMENT 20020731;RO PAYMENT 20020731;SI PAYMENT 20020731