Global Patent Index - EP 1254564 A2

EP 1254564 A2 2002-11-06 - FORMAT FOR RECORDING AUDIO AND VIDEO ON A HARD DISK DRIVE

Title (en)

FORMAT FOR RECORDING AUDIO AND VIDEO ON A HARD DISK DRIVE

Title (de)

FORMAT FÜR DIE AUFNAHME VON AUDIO UND VIDEO AUF EINEM FESTPLATTENLAUFWERK

Title (fr)

FORMAT D'ENREGISTREMENT D'AUDIO ET DE VIDEO SUR UN DISQUE DUR

Publication

EP 1254564 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 01997804 A

Priority

  • US 0144266 W
  • US 72296600 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0243055A2] A format for recording audio and video data onto a hard disk drive (100) includes recording video data (4) onto a storage medium, recording audio data (8) onto the storage medium and recording audio identification (7) onto the storage medium for controlling selective reading of the audio data with the video data. The data structure resulting from the recording includes a video data stream forming part of readable multimedia data recorded on the hard disk drive. The data structure further includes an audio data stream forming part of the readable multimedia data. The audio data stream includes audio data units and audio identification controlling selective reading of the audio data units with the video data.

[origin: WO0243055A2] A format for recording audio and video data onto a hard disk drive includes recording video data onto a storage medium, recording audio data onto the storage medium and recording audio identification onto the storage medium for controlling selective reading of the audio data with the video data. The data structure resulting from the recording includes a video data stream forming part of readable multimedia data recorded on the hard disk drive. The data structure further includes an audio data stream forming part of the readable multimedia data. The audio data stream includes audio data units and audio identification controlling selective reading of the audio data units with the video data.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04N 5/91

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G11B 20/12 (2006.01); G11B 27/034 (2006.01); G11B 27/30 (2006.01); H04N 5/783 (2006.01); H04N 5/781 (2006.01); H04N 5/926 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G11B 27/3027 (2013.01); G11B 27/034 (2013.01); H04N 5/783 (2013.01); G11B 2020/10537 (2013.01); G11B 2220/20 (2013.01); H04N 5/781 (2013.01); H04N 5/9267 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0243055A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE ES FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 0243055 A2 20020530; WO 0243055 A3 20020718; AU 1788402 A 20020603; EP 1254564 A2 20021106

INPADOC legal status


2005-12-28 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050601

2005-10-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: THOMSON LICENSING

2004-06-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: THOMSON LICENSING S.A.

2004-05-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE ES FR GB IT LI

2003-10-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030820

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI