Global Patent Index - EP 1254614 A1

EP 1254614 A1 2002-11-06 - Work table

Title (en)

Work table

Title (de)

Arbeitstisch

Title (fr)

Table de travail

Publication

EP 1254614 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 02009430 A

Priority

DE 20107428 U

Abstract (en)

The working table is designed so that under the table top (1) a rotation element (4,3,7) is arranged, at which a working appliance shaft (5) is located. The rotation element (7) has a rotation shaft (4), which extends vertically. The rotation element has support (9) for the working appliance shaft (5). The rotation element (7) has holders (12) for a fixing element (6), for the working appliance shaft (5).

Abstract (de)

Bei einem Arbeitstisch mit einer Tischplatte (1) auf einem Gestell, soll unterhalb der Tischplatte (1) ein Drehelement (4,7) angeordnet sein, an welchem sich eine Arbeitsgerätschaft (5) befindet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47B 21/03

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 21/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47B 21/00 (2013.01); A47B 2097/006 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE GB LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 20107428 U1 20011031; EP 1254614 A1 20021106

INPADOC legal status


2007-05-16 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20061121

2003-07-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030613

2003-07-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): CH DE GB LI

2003-03-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030125

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI