Global Patent Index - EP 1254619 A1

EP 1254619 A1 2002-11-06 - Combination rack

Title (en)

Combination rack

Title (de)

Kombinationsregal

Title (fr)

Présentoir combiné

Publication

EP 1254619 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 01110668 A

Priority

  • EP 01110668 A
  • US 84837301 A

Abstract (en)

A combination rack includes two upright boards (1,1), two locating rods (21,22) detachably connected between the upright boards (1,1), a plurality of stretcher rods (3,4) detachably connected between the upright boards (1,1), and a flexible sheet member (2) connected between the first locating rod (21) and the second locating rod (22) and extended over the stretcher rods (3,4) and adapted to hold things between the upright boards (1,1).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47F 7/08; A47B 45/00; A47B 87/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 43/00 (2006.01); A47B 45/00 (2006.01); A47F 7/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47B 45/00 (2013.01); A47B 43/003 (2013.01); A47F 7/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1254619 A1 20021106; US 2002162815 A1 20021107

INPADOC legal status


2006-08-30 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060721

2005-02-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041223

2003-07-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR

2003-05-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030312

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI