Global Patent Index - EP 1254620 A1

EP 1254620 A1 2002-11-06 - Connecting element for curtain rods

Title (en)

Connecting element for curtain rods

Title (de)

Verbindungselement für Gardinenstangen

Title (fr)

Elément de connexion pour tringles à rideau

Publication

EP 1254620 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 02002232 A

Priority

DE 20107478 U

Abstract (en)

The connector for joining two curtain rods at an angle comprises tubes (20) into which the rods fit. These are attached to a central tube (10) by pivots (30) which can be fixed in position by bolts (40).

Abstract (de)

Ein Verbindungselement für zwei Gardinenstangen, dass zwei Außenelemente (20) umfasst, die über jeweils ein Gelenk (30) mit einem Mittenelement (10) verbunden sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47H 1/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47H 1/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47H 1/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 20107478 U1 20010816; EP 1254620 A1 20021106

INPADOC legal status


2005-07-06 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20041228

2004-09-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040817

2003-07-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR LI

2003-05-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030315

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI