Global Patent Index - EP 1254683 A1

EP 1254683 A1 2002-11-06 - Floating apparatus

Title (en)

Floating apparatus

Title (de)

Schwimmvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Appareil flottant

Publication

EP 1254683 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 01201613 A

Priority

EP 01201613 A

Abstract (en)

Described is a floating apparatus containing two elongate floating bodies (1) which run parallel at a distance from each other. The floating bodies (1) are mutually connected by at least one bracket (2) situated in the plane of the floating bodies. Another two brackets (3,6) preferably mutually connect the upper part of two floating bodies at the front and at the rear. These floating apparatuses can be applied for both swimming instruction and for recreation. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63B 69/14; A63B 31/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63B 69/14 (2006.01); B62B 15/00 (2006.01); B63B 35/73 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B63B 35/73 (2013.01); A63B 69/14 (2013.01); B62B 15/00 (2013.01); A63B 2225/605 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1254683 A1 20021106

INPADOC legal status


2004-10-27 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040420

2003-11-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031009

2003-07-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-07-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030506

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI