Global Patent Index - EP 1254684 A1

EP 1254684 A1 2002-11-06 - Improved binding of a boot to a snowboard

Title (en)

Improved binding of a boot to a snowboard

Title (de)

Verbesserte Kupplung eines Stiefels an ein Snowboard

Title (fr)

Perfectionnement pour dispositif de retenue d'une chaussure sur une planche de glisse sur neige du type surf

Publication

EP 1254684 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 02354060 A

Priority

FR 0106109 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US7216889B2] A binding ( 2 ) which retains a boot ( 11 ) on a snowboard ( 1 ) includes a base member ( 4 ). Rear walls ( 8 a, 8 b) and a rear arch ( 9 ) with a rear portion ( 21 ) of the base member support a heel of the boot. A front support piece ( 18 ) to which a toe strap ( 16 ) is pivotally mounted ( 24 a, 24 b), is adjustably mounted to a front part ( 20 ) of the base member. The front support piece is longitudinally adjustable and a length of the toe strap is adjustable to enable the binding to receive boots of different length and style.

Abstract (fr)

Dispositif de retenue (2) d'une chaussure (11) sur une planche de glisse sur neige destinée plus particulièrement à la pratique du surf, du type comprenant une embase (4) portant au moins un organe de retenue avant (16) retenant l'avant (14) de la chaussure (11), l'embase (4) comprenant une pièce d'appui avant (18) pour l'extrémité avant de la chaussure, caractérisé en ce que la pièce d'appui avant (18) et l'organe de retenue avant (16) forment un ensemble avant d'appui et de retenue mobile sur l'embase pour pouvoir être réglable en position longitudinale par rapport à l'embase. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63C 9/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63C 10/22 (2012.01); A63C 10/28 (2012.01); A63C 10/04 (2012.01); A63C 10/24 (2012.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63C 10/285 (2013.01); A63C 10/22 (2013.01); A63C 10/04 (2013.01); A63C 10/24 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

[XA] WO 9842419 A1 19981001 - SIMS SPORTS INC [US]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1254684 A1 20021106; EP 1254684 B1 20040331; AT 262962 T 20040415; DE 60200305 D1 20040506; DE 60200305 T2 20050310; FR 2824275 A1 20021108; FR 2824275 B1 20030815; US 2002163162 A1 20021107; US 7216889 B2 20070515

INPADOC legal status


2015-02-27 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140430

2015-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141101

2015-01-29 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60200305

- Effective date: 20141101

2015-01-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20141231

2014-11-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60200305

2013-08-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130523

- Year of fee payment: 12

2013-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130429

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080417

2009-02-27 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080417

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070504

- Year of fee payment: 6

2007-04-27 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20070427

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-03-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050104

2004-12-01 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-05-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60200305 P 20040506

2004-05-05 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2004-03-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR IT

2003-07-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR IT

2003-06-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030417

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI