Global Patent Index - EP 1254685 A1

EP 1254685 A1 2002-11-06 - Snowboardbinding

Title (en)

Snowboardbinding

Title (de)

Snowboardbindung

Title (fr)

Fixation de surf des neiges

Publication

EP 1254685 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 02405336 A

Priority

FR 0105857 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US2002163161A1] Snowboard binding has a base plate (1) having an arch (4), a rear support piece (24) which can be displaced on the base plate, a foot strap (13), optionally an instep strap (5), and a linking device for kinematic linking between the foot strap and the rear support piece. The kinematic linking device has linking pieces (14, 15, 25, 26) connecting the support piece (24) and the foot strap (13) and passing on each side of the central zone of the base plate. This binding may be adjusted rapidly, symmetrically or non-symmetrically, without the necessity of removing and replacing screws.

Abstract (fr)

Fixation de surf comprenant une embase (1) portant un arceau (4), une pièce d'appui arrière (24) déplaçable sur l'embase, une courroie de pied (13), éventuellement une courroie de cou de pied (5), et des moyens de liaison cinématique entre la courroie de pied et la pièce d'appui arrière. Les moyens de liaison cinématique sont constitués de pièces de liaison (14, 15, 25, 26) reliant la pièce d'appui (24) et la courroie de pied (13) et passant de chaque côté de la zone centrale de l'embase. Cette fixation peut être réglée rapidement, symétriquement ou non, sans qu'il soit nécessaire d'enlever et de remettre des vis. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63C 9/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63C 10/04 (2012.01); A63C 10/24 (2012.01); A63C 10/18 (2012.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63C 10/24 (2013.01); A63C 10/04 (2013.01); A63C 10/18 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1254685 A1 20021106; EP 1254685 B1 20060830; AT 337837 T 20060915; DE 60214274 D1 20061012; DE 60214274 T2 20070920; FR 2824274 A1 20021108; FR 2824274 B1 20030905; US 2002163161 A1 20021107; US 6886849 B2 20050503

INPADOC legal status


2012-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110502

2012-01-20 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20111230

2010-07-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100519

- Year of fee payment: 9

2010-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091103

2008-08-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070424

2008-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080424

- Year of fee payment: 7

2007-08-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070531

2006-10-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60214274 P 20061012

2006-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR IT

2006-08-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060830

2006-08-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MANDON, FLORENCE

2005-07-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050520

2003-07-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR IT

2003-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021031

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI