Global Patent Index - EP 1254716 A1

EP 1254716 A1 2002-11-06 - Integral assembly of reagent tubes and seal caps

Title (en)

Integral assembly of reagent tubes and seal caps

Title (de)

Einheit bestehend aus Reagenzgläsern mit Verschlusskappen

Title (fr)

Ensemble comprenant des éprouvettes avec des capuchons étanches

Publication

EP 1254716 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 01401330 A

Priority

CA 2343959 A

Abstract (en)

An integral assembly (10) of a multiplicity of spaced reagent tubes (12) arranged in an aligned series wherein the tubes are integrally linked to one another by connecting portions (18) and to a corresponding multiplicity of independently spaced seal caps (20) by a multiplicity of bands (30), each band having one end integral with a seal cap and an opposite end integrally connected to two adjacent tubes. The bands extend perpendicularly to the series of aligned tubes and include an oblique hinge portion which is deformable so as to allow the cap to be independently manipulatable to pivot angularly and to superimpose the open end (16) of a tube for sealing. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B01L 3/00; B01L 3/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01L 3/00 (2006.01); B01L 3/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B01L 3/50853 (2013.01); B01L 3/50825 (2013.01); B01L 3/50855 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1254716 A1 20021106; CA 2343959 A1 20021102

INPADOC legal status


2006-03-29 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050920

2004-01-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031216

2003-07-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-03-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021221

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI