Global Patent Index - EP 1254749 A2

EP 1254749 A2 2002-11-06 - Apparatus for manufacturing rectangular furniture panel with glued on edges

Title (en)

Apparatus for manufacturing rectangular furniture panel with glued on edges

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Herstellung von rechteckigen Möbelplatten mit angeleimter Kante

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour la fabrication d'un panneau de meuble avec de bordures collées

Publication

EP 1254749 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02007678 A

Priority

DE 20107572 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: US2002162603A1] Apparatus for producing rectangular furniture boards with a glued-on edge, in which the following are arranged one after another in the passage direction: a longitudinal sawing device (14), which divides a rectangular initial board (12) into a plurality of parallel longitudinal boards (12a, 12b, 12c, 12d), a longitudinal gluing device (31), which in each case glues a longitudinal edge onto both longitudinal sides of a longitudinal board (12a) passing through and machines the edge, a transverse sawing device (38), which divides a longitudinal board (12a) transversely with respect to its longitudinal direction into furniture boards (39) with a predetermined size, a transverse gluing device (40), which in each case glues a transverse edge onto both transverse sides of a furniture board (39) passing through and machines this edge.

Abstract (de)

Bei der Vorrichtung zur Herstellung von rechteckigen Möbelplatten mit angeleimter Kante sind eine Längssägeeinrichtung (14), die eine rechteckige Ausgangsplatte (12) in mehrere parallele Längsplatten (12a, 12b, 12c, 12d) teilt, eine Längsleimeinrichtung (31), die auf beide Längsseiten einer durchlaufenden Längsplatte (12a) jeweils eine Längskante aufleimt und diese bearbeitet, eine Quersägeeinrichtung (38), die eine Längsplatte (12a) quer zu ihrer Längsrichtung in Möbelplatten (39) mit vorherbestimmter Größe teilt, und eine Querleimeinrichtung (40), die auf beide Querseiten einer durchlaufenden Möbelplatte (39) jeweils eine Querkante aufleimt und diese bearbeitet, in Durchlaufrichtung nacheinander angeordnet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B27D 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B27B 5/075 (2006.01); B27D 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B27B 5/075 (2013.01); B27D 5/003 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

DE 20107572 U1 20010712; EP 1254749 A2 20021106; EP 1254749 A3 20070124; US 2002162603 A1 20021107; US 6719023 B2 20040413

INPADOC legal status


2008-02-27 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080115

2007-09-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2007-08-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070622

2007-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2007-01-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2005-03-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: OTT VERWALTUNGS GMBH

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI