Global Patent Index - EP 1254761 A2

EP 1254761 A2 2002-11-06 - Round-baler for waste materials

Title (en)

Round-baler for waste materials

Title (de)

Rundballenpresse für Abfallmaterialien

Title (fr)

Presse à balles rondes pour déchets

Publication

EP 1254761 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02009628 A

Priority

DE 10121831 A

Abstract (en)

Round baler for waste material comprises a press chamber defined by revolving conveying elements (3, 4) and a wrapping device (20, 23) for covering a round bale (46) formed in the press chamber with a section of a covering material (21). The covering device has a starting device (22) for inserting the covering material through a feed gap (5) in the press chamber. The starting device presses the covering material at least in the starting phase of the covering process against the carrier surface of at least one driven conveying element positioned in front of the feed gap and conveying the covering material into the press chamber. Preferred Features: The starting device has a freely rotating feed roll (27). The covering strip consists of film, stretch film, paper, net or a similar material extending over the entire width of the bale.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Rundballenpresse für Abfallmaterialien mit einem durch antreibbare Förderelemente (3, 4) begrenzten Preßraum (2) und mit einer Umhüllvorrichtung (18, 20, 22, 23) zum Umhüllen des Mantels eines in dem Preßraum (2) gebildeten Rundballens (46) mit einem Abschnitt einer Mantelbahn (21), welche eine Startvorrichtung (22) zum Einbringen der Mantelbahn (21) durch einen Zuführspalt (5) in den Preßraum (2) aufweist. Um die Rundballenpresse hinsichtlich der Umhüllvorrichtung zu verbessern und insbesondere einen Start des Umhüllvorganges per Knopfdruck oder vollautomatisch zu ermöglichen, wird vorgeschlagen, daß die Startvorrichtung (22) die Mantelbahn (21) wenigstens in der Startphase des Umhüllungsvorganges gegen die Mitnehmerfläche wenigstens eines dem Zuführspalt (5) vorgelagerten, angetriebenen Förderelementes (10, 44) drückt, welches die Mantelbahn (21) in den Preßraum (2) fördert. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B30B 9/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A01F 15/08 (2006.01); B30B 9/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B30B 9/3082 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1254761 A2 20021106; EP 1254761 A3 20030604; EP 1254761 B1 20100707; DE 10121831 A1 20021107; DE 50214521 D1 20100819; JP 2003009646 A 20030114; US 2003024406 A1 20030206; US 6681689 B2 20040127

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161101

2016-11-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50214521

2016-02-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150430

2016-01-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150427

2016-01-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20151231

2015-12-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150427

2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150910

- Year of fee payment: 14

2015-02-04 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20150108 AND 20150114

2014-12-11 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Document: DE 50214521

- Effective date: 20141024

2014-12-05 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: WELGER RECYCLING ENGINEERING GMBH, DE

- Effective date: 20141103

2014-10-24 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Document: DE 50214521

2014-10-09 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: WELGER RECYCLING ENGINEERING GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: LELY VERMEER MASCHINENFABRIK GMBH, 38304 WOLFENBUETTEL, DE

- Document: DE 50214521

- Effective date: 20140902

2014-08-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140417

- Year of fee payment: 13

2014-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140428

- Year of fee payment: 13

2014-06-06 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: LELY VERMEER MASCHINENFABRIK GMBH, DE

- Effective date: 20140507

2014-05-22 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: LELY VERMEER MASCHINENFABRIK GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: WELGER MASCHINENFABRIK GMBH, 38304 WOLFENBUETTEL, DE

- Document: DE 50214521

- Effective date: 20140410

2014-05-22 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: WELGER RECYCLING ENGINEERING GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: WELGER MASCHINENFABRIK GMBH, 38304 WOLFENBUETTEL, DE

- Document: DE 50214521

- Effective date: 20140410

2012-01-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110430

2011-10-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: WELGER MASCHINENFABRIK G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20110430

2011-07-14 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 50214521

- Effective date: 20110408

2011-06-15 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20110408

2011-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100707

2011-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100707

2010-10-27 [REG NL VDEP] INVALID IN THE NETHERLANDS AS NO TRANSLATION HAS BEEN FILED

- Effective date: 20100707

2010-08-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50214521 P 20100819

2010-07-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT NL

2010-07-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-04-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: WELGER MASCHINENFABRIK GMBH

2004-02-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT NL

2004-02-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031204

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI