Global Patent Index - EP 1254770 A2

EP 1254770 A2 2002-11-06 - Device for fixing a rubber blanket

Title (en)

Device for fixing a rubber blanket

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Befestigen eines Gummituches

Title (fr)

Dispositif permettant de fixer un blanchet

Publication

EP 1254770 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02017782 A

Priority

  • DE 19860477 A
  • EP 99964444 A

Abstract (en)

The rubber cloth (03) has a reinforcing rail (07) on one end (04) and another (08) on the other end (06). Both the reinforcing rails are longer than the width of the rubber cloth by at least five mm on both sides. The rails may project equally or unequally beyond the rubber cloth. The rails may be of unequal length at the beginning and end of the rubber cloth.

Abstract (de)

Bei einer Vorrichtung zum Befestigen eines Gummituches (03) auf einem Gummituchzylinder (02) weist mindestens ein Ende (04;06) des Gummituches eine Verstärkungsschiene (07;08) auf, mindestens beide Enden (12;13) der Verstärkungsschiene sind über eine Breite (20) des Gummituches überstehend angeordnet und die Vorrichtung zum Befestigen des Gummituches ist mit den überstehenden Enden zusammenwirkend angeordnet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 30/04; B41F 27/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 27/12 (2006.01); B41F 30/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 30/04 (2013.01); B41F 27/1281 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB LI SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19860477 A1 20000706; DE 19860477 C2 20010201; EP 1140501 A1 20011010; EP 1140501 B1 20030115; EP 1254770 A2 20021106; EP 1254770 A3 20021120; EP 1254770 B1 20031001; EP 1254771 A2 20021106; EP 1254771 A3 20021120; EP 1254771 B1 20030917; US 6520079 B1 20030218; WO 0038921 A1 20000706

INPADOC legal status


2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071231

2008-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071221

2008-11-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20081020

2008-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071231

2008-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080701

2008-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071231

2008-10-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071222

2008-08-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20071221

2008-08-19 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2008-07-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-12-19 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20061219

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-12-04 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20061204

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-11-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20061128

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-11-27 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20061127

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-11-27 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20061127

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-09-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040702

2004-05-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-12-02 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-11-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59907238 P 20031106

2003-10-22 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-10-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-10-01 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 1140501 P

2003-10-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI SE

2003-10-01 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-08-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI SE

2002-12-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021011

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI SE

2002-11-06 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 1140501

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI SE