Global Patent Index - EP 1254782 A2

EP 1254782 A2 2002-11-06 - Thermal transfer ribbon

Title (en)

Thermal transfer ribbon

Title (de)

Thermisches Übertragungsband

Title (fr)

Ruban de transfert thermique

Publication

EP 1254782 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 02252999 A

Priority

US 84908301 A

Abstract (en)

A thermal transfer ribbon (10) with an effective contrast ratio of at least about 87 percent and a brightness of at least about 70. The ribbon (10) contains a flexible substrate (12) and, disposed over the substrate (12), at least one coating (14,16) containing from about 45 to about 90 weight percent of titanium dioxide and from about 0.05 to about 20 weight percent of glass particles. This coating has a coat weight from about 3 to about 20 grams per square meter. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41M 5/40

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41M 5/42 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41M 5/426 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1254782 A2 20021106; EP 1254782 A3 20040211

INPADOC legal status


2005-07-06 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20041229

2004-11-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-08-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040618

2004-06-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040419

2004-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-02-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI