Global Patent Index - EP 1254844 A1

EP 1254844 A1 2002-11-06 - Box-pallet

Title (en)

Box-pallet

Title (de)

Palletenbehälter

Title (fr)

Dispositif de caisse-palette

Publication

EP 1254844 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 02360120 A

Priority

  • FR 0105762 A
  • FR 0110926 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2824047A1] The box pallet comprises a pallet (6) and a box (2) able to be unfolded which has side walls (3,3') and a bottom (4). The box has a first unfolding element (7) folded up on the pallet comprising panels and flaps (8,8') intended to define the side walls and a frame (9) intended to rest on the pallet. A second element (15) is defined by a plate (16) located on the pallet around which the frame is positioned. A third foldable element (17) located on the pallet comprises a longitudinal band (18) edged by two articulated flaps (19,19') which unfolded constitute the bottom.

Abstract (fr)

L'invention concerne un dispositif (1) de caisse-palette en kit défini par une palette (6) et par une caisse (2) dépliable, disposée sur cette palette (6) et qui, dépliée, présente des parois latérales (3, 3') et un fond (4). Cette caisse (2) est caractérisée par le fait qu'elle est définie par un premier élément (7) dépliable, disposé replié sur la palette (6), comportant des panneaux et des rabats (8, 8') destinés à définir, respectivement, les parois latérales (3; 3') et un cadre (9) destiné à reposer sur la palette (6) ; un second élément (15) défini par une plaque (16), disposée sur ladite palette (6), autour de laquelle (16) vient se positionner le cadre (9) dudit premier élément (7) déplié ; un troisième élément (17) pliable, disposé sur ladite palette (6), comportant une bande longitudinale (18) bordée de deux volets articulés (19, 19') et destiné à constituer, déplié, le fond (4). L'invention concerne, encore, un dispositif (1) de caisse-palette, notamment défini à partir d'un tel kit. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 19/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 19/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 19/20 (2013.01); B65D 2519/00019 (2013.01); B65D 2519/00029 (2013.01); B65D 2519/00044 (2013.01); B65D 2519/00064 (2013.01); B65D 2519/00099 (2013.01); B65D 2519/00159 (2013.01); B65D 2519/00194 (2013.01); B65D 2519/00273 (2013.01); B65D 2519/00323 (2013.01); B65D 2519/00333 (2013.01); B65D 2519/00497 (2013.01); B65D 2519/00597 (2013.01); B65D 2519/00641 (2013.01); B65D 2519/00711 (2013.01); B65D 2519/00915 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1254844 A1 20021106; FR 2824047 A1 20021031; FR 2824047 B1 20030829

INPADOC legal status


2004-12-01 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040602

2004-01-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031119

2003-07-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030412

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI