Global Patent Index - EP 1254846 A1

EP 1254846 A1 2002-11-06 - Reclosable flexible package

Title (en)

Reclosable flexible package

Title (de)

Wiederverschliessbare flexible Verpackung

Title (fr)

Emballage souple refermable

Publication

EP 1254846 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 02290913 A

Priority

FR 0105264 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2823722A1] The packaging comprises a body, initially sealed at one end, comprising two parts (26A,26B) whose longitudinal edges are connected together along a longitudinal weld (14). One of the parts extends outwards from the body beyond the weld to form a flap (36). A weakened tearing line (42) is formed on the flap along the weld. This tearing line delimits a band (43A) locally detachable from the body and an adhesive (44) carried by the band for later sticking of the band against the package external surface.

Abstract (fr)

L'emballage souple comporte un corps initialement obturé à une extrémité dans une région destinée à être ouverte, le corps comportant au moins deux pans (26A, 26B) dont les bords longitudinaux sont liés l'un à l'autre suivant une soudure longitudinale (14) s'étendant suivant la hauteur du corps, au moins l'un des pans (26A, 26B) se prolongeant à l'extérieur du corps au-delà de la soudure longitudinale (14) pour former un volet (36). Il comporte une ligne d'affaiblissement (42) favorisant la déchirure qui est formée sur le volet (36) le long de la soudure longitudinale (14), ladite ligne d'affaiblissement (42) délimitant sur le volet (36), une bande (43A) au moins localement détachable du corps de l'emballage et un adhésif (44) porté par une bande (43A), lequel adhésif (44) est adapté pour assurer un collage ultérieur de la bande contre la surface externe de l'emballage. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 33/16; B65D 33/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 33/16 (2006.01); B65D 33/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 33/20 (2013.01); B65D 33/165 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Citation (third parties)

Third party :

US 5928749 A 19990727 - FORMAN HAROLD M [US]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1254846 A1 20021106; EP 1254846 B1 20080319; AT 389594 T 20080415; DE 60225620 D1 20080430; DE 60225620 T2 20090402; DK 1254846 T3 20080714; ES 2303846 T3 20080901; FR 2823722 A1 20021025; FR 2823722 B1 20030725; PT 1254846 E 20080630

INPADOC legal status


2018-09-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20180411

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20180420

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-07-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20180410

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-07-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20180410

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180327

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-07-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20180402

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20180503

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20180416

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-07-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20180410

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-06-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20180412

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20180314

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20180326

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20180329

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-03-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-04-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-04-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-10-29 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080620

2010-08-31 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080319

2010-07-30 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080411

2009-09-30 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080319

2009-02-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20081222

2008-11-28 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080430

2008-09-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2303846 T3

2008-08-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080319

2008-07-14 [REG DK T3] EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS

2008-07-08 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2008-06-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20080618

2008-04-30 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: FRENCH

2008-04-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60225620 P 20080430

2008-04-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2008-03-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2008-03-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2008-03-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: AMCOR FLEXIBLES TRANSPAC N.V.

2003-07-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030416

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI