Global Patent Index - EP 1254857 A2

EP 1254857 A2 2002-11-06 - Device for collating flat objects into stacks and for the further processing of the stacks

Title (en)

Device for collating flat objects into stacks and for the further processing of the stacks

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Zusammentragen flacher Gegenstände zu Stapeln und zur Weiterverarbeitung der Stapel

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour assembler des articles plats en piles et pour le traitement ultérieur des piles

Publication

EP 1254857 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02405322 A

Priority

CH 7642001 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: CA2382982A1] Flat articles are gathered on stack supports (2) being conveyed past feed points substantially continuously and one after the other. After the gathering operation, bottom edge zones (13) of the gathered articles are exposed for a further processing operation. The corresponding device comprises continuously conveyed stack supports (2) each with an inclined supporting surface (3) and a foot element (4) located in the bottom area of the supporting surface (3). The foot elements are actively connected with the supporting surfaces i n such a manner, that they are capable of being pressed against the supporting surface and of bein g distanced from the supporting surface. In an exposure zone downstream of the gathering zone (1) , stack support means (10) being conveyed in synchronism with the stack supports (2) and substantially in the same direction and control means we provided. The stack support means are arranged in such a manner, that at the entrance to the exposure zone (1) they are positioned immediately underneath the stack supports and that further downstream they move away from the stack supports (2) in a downwards direction. The control means act on the foot elements (4) of stack supports (2) conveyed through the exposure zone in such a manner, that these are distance d from the supporting surfaces (3) at the entrance to the exposure zone for letting the stacks slide down onto the stack support means, and that the stacks having slid down onto the stack support means (10) are clamped between the foot element and the supporting surface. The exposed edge zones (13) of the gathered articles can then be processed in a simple way and/or can be taken hold of by further conveying means. The device is simple and is capable of being adjust ed to suit various applications.

Abstract (de)

Flache Gegenstände werden auf Stapelauflagen (2) zusammengetragen, wofür die Stapelauflagen (2) im wesentlichen kontinuierlich hintereinander an Zuführungsstellen vorbei gefördert werden. Nach dem Zusammentragen werden untere Kantenbereiche (13) der zusammengetragenen Gegenstände für eine Weiterverarbeitung freigelegt. Die entsprechende Vorrichtung weist im wesentlichen kontinuierlich förderbare Stapelauflagen (2) mit je einer schiefen Auflagefläche (3) und einem im unteren Bereich der Auflagefläche (3) angeordneten Fusselement (4) auf. Die Fusselemente sind derart mit den Auflageflächen wirkverbunden, dass sie gegen die Auflagefläche gepresst und von der Auflagefläche distanziert werden können. In einem auf den Zusammentragbereich folgenden Freilegungsbereich (1) sind mit den Stapelauflagen (2) synchron und im wesentlichen gleichgerichtet geförderte Stapelstützmittel (10) und Steuermittel vorgesehen. Die Stapelstützmittel sind derart angeordnet, dass sie am Eingang des Freilegungsbereichs (1) unmittelbar unter den Stapelauflagen positioniert sind und sich dann gegen unten von den Stapelauflagen (2) entfernen. Die Steuermittel wirken auf die Fusselemente (4) von durch den Freilegungsbereich geförderten Stapelauflagen derart, dass diese am Eingang des Freilegungsbereichs von den Auflageflächen distanziert werden und die Stapel auf die Stützelemente abrutschen, und derart, dass die auf die Stapelstützmittel (10) abgerutschten Stapel dann zwischen Fusselement und Auflagefläche eingeklemmt und so fixiert werden. Die freigelegten Kantenbereiche (13) der zusammengetragenen Gegenstände können einfach bearbeitet und/oder von weiteren Fördermitteln erfasst werden. Die Vorrichtung ist einfach und kann einfach für verschiedene Anforderungen eingestellt werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 39/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 39/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 29/28 (2013.01); B65H 39/06 (2013.01); B65H 2301/4321 (2013.01); B65H 2301/4433 (2013.01); B65H 2301/44712 (2013.01); B65H 2301/4476 (2013.01); B65H 2405/50 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. B65H 2301/44712 + B65H 2220/02
  2. B65H 2301/44712 + B65H 2220/01
  3. B65H 2301/4476 + B65H 2220/02

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1254857 A2 20021106; EP 1254857 A3 20030129; EP 1254857 B1 20050824; AT 302731 T 20050915; AU 3560002 A 20021031; AU 783529 B2 20051103; CA 2382982 A1 20021026; CA 2382982 C 20090602; DE 50204002 D1 20050929; DK 1254857 T3 20051219; ES 2247288 T3 20060301; US 2002159874 A1 20021031; US 6708968 B2 20040323

INPADOC legal status


2016-04-29 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150430

2016-02-29 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150420

2016-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151103

2016-01-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150430

2016-01-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150430

2015-12-15 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2015-11-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2015-11-23 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

- Effective date: 20150430

2015-11-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50204002

2015-07-09 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50204002

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE UND RECHTSANWALT DR. WEISS, ARA, DE

2015-07-09 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50204002

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE UND RECHTSANWALT WEISS, ARAT & , DE

2014-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20140702

- Year of fee payment: 13

2014-09-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20140422

- Year of fee payment: 13

2014-08-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20140418

- Year of fee payment: 13

2014-08-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140418

- Year of fee payment: 13

2013-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120420

2013-07-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20130716

2013-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120419

2013-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120419

2012-12-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120419

2011-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110421

- Year of fee payment: 10

2011-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110421

- Year of fee payment: 10

2011-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20110426

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-11-28 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050824

2008-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050824

2008-07-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060419

2008-07-31 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050824

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: FERAG AG

- Effective date: 20060430

2006-10-20 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2006-10-20 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061020

2006-08-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060526

2006-04-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060430

2006-04-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060430

2006-04-19 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060419

2006-03-22 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2006-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2247288 T3

2006-02-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2006-01-24 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060124

2005-12-19 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2005-12-13 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2005-11-24 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051124

2005-11-16 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20051021

2005-10-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: FREI PATENTANWALTSBUERO

2005-09-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50204002 P 20050929

2005-09-21 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2005-08-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-08-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2005-08-24 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-08-24 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050824

2005-08-24 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050824

2005-08-24 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050824

2005-08-10 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: DEVICE FOR COLLATING FLAT OBJECTS INTO STACKS AND FOR THE FURTHER PROCESSING OF THE STACKS

2003-10-15 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-08-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030621

2003-01-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-01-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI